EP3104947 - SPORTS SYSTEM HAVING AN ANTI-STATIC FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/51] | ANTI-STATIC SPORTS EQUIPMENT, SPORTS SYSTEM HAVING AN ANTI-STATIC FUNCTION AND SPORTS CLOTHING SYSTEM FOR A SPORTS SYSTEM | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harml, Markus Schlossstraße 34 5550 Radstadt / AT | For all designated states Huber Ski-Con KG Bräuleiten 18 5550 Radstadt / AT | [2019/45] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Harml, Markus Schlossstraße 34 5550 Radstadt / AT | ||
For all designated states Huber Ski-Con KG Bräuleitn 18 5550 Radstadt / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Rupert Bräuleiten 18 5550 Radstadt / AT | 02 /
HARML, Markus Schlossstrasse 34 A-5550 Radstadt / AT | [2019/41] |
Former [2016/51] | 01 /
HUBER, Rupert Bräuleitn 18 A-5550 Radstadt / AT | ||
02 /
HARML, Markus Schlossstrasse 34 A-5550 Radstadt / AT | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2016/51] | Application number, filing date | 14830370.4 | 26.11.2014 | [2016/51] | WO2014AT50280 | Priority number, date | AT20140050002 | 02.01.2014 Original published format: AT 500022014 | AT20140050503 | 18.07.2014 Original published format: AT 505032014 | [2016/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015100463 | Date: | 09.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3104947 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3104947 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/12, A43B7/36 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A43B7/36 (EP,US);
A43B5/00 (AT);
A41D13/0015 (EP,US);
A41D13/008 (EP,AT);
A41D13/02 (US);
A41D19/015 (US);
A41D31/26 (EP,US);
A42B3/061 (US);
A42B3/185 (US);
A43B17/003 (US);
A43B23/07 (US);
A43B3/34 (EP,AT,US);
A43B5/002 (US);
A43B5/04 (EP,AT,US);
A43B5/0411 (US);
A43B5/0496 (US);
A43C15/068 (US);
A45B7/00 (AT);
A63C11/00 (AT);
A63C11/22 (AT);
A63C5/06 (AT);
A63C5/12 (EP,US);
B62B13/00 (AT);
A41D2600/10 (EP);
A63C2203/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPORTSYSTEM MIT ANTISTATIKFUNKTION | [2019/44] | English: | SPORTS SYSTEM HAVING AN ANTI-STATIC FUNCTION | [2019/44] | French: | SYSTÈME SPORTIF À FONCTION ANTISTATIQUE | [2019/44] |
Former [2016/51] | ANTISTATISCHES SPORTGERÄT, SPORTSYSTEM MIT ANTISTATIKFUNKTION SOWIE SPORTBEKLEIDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EIN SPORTSYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/51] | ANTI-STATIC SPORTS EQUIPMENT, SPORTS SYSTEM HAVING AN ANTI-STATIC FUNCTION AND SPORTS CLOTHING SYSTEM FOR A SPORTS SYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/51] | APPAREIL DE SPORT ANTISTATIQUE, SYSTÈME SPORTIF À FONCTION ANTISTATIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT SPORTIF POUR SYSTÈME SPORTIF | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 02.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19205258.7 / EP3622841 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2014 | AL | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | ES | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | IT | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SE | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | IE | 26.11.2019 | LU | 26.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | GB | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.11.2014 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
IT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GB | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
IE | 26.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 26.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
ES | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
SE | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2147904 (REUTER MASCHINEN); | [A]JPH09313662 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]WO9825492 (TECHNOSTAR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]GB2320669 (BANKS DAVID LEONARD [US]); | [A]JP2000312601 (NOSAKKUSU KK); | [A]US2009032517 (SOPUCH MICHAEL DOMINIC [US], et al); | [A]CN201541805U (SHENZHEN SELEN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [A]US2011012319 (KUCZYNSKI CHRIS [US], et al); | [XA]US2012034830 (STOUGHTON ANTHONY F [US]) | by applicant | DE2147904 | DE29700693U | DE10255408 | EP2005851 |