EP3082847 - LIPIDATED INCRETIN RECEPTOR LIGAND HUMAN IMMUNOGLOBULIN FC-REGION FUSION POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 518 Indiana Avenue Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2017/25] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Indiana University Research and Technology Corporation 351 West 10th Street Indianapolis, IN 46202 / US | ||
For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLI, Sara Steigstrasse 13 5452 Oberrohrdorf / CH | 02 /
BLEICHER, Konrad Reichsgrafenstrasse 16 79102 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
DIMARCHI, Richard D. 10890 Wilmington Drive Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | 04 /
HOFFMANN, Eike Kienbachstrasse 1B 82211 Herrsching a. Ammersee / DE | 05 /
KITAS, Eric A. Eichbergweg 4 4147 Aesch Baselland / CH | 06 /
KONKAR, Anish A. 5901 Montrose Road Apt. 603 North Bethesda, Maryland 20852 / US | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2016/43] | Oficina Ponti, SLP C. de Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14830920.6 | 19.12.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014US71454 | Priority number, date | US201361918950P | 20.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361918950 P | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015095684 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3082847 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/26, C07K14/605, A61K47/48 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/543 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Title | German: | FUSIONSPOLYPEPTIDE AUS LIPIDIERTEM INKRETIN-REZEPTOR-LIGAND UND HUMAN-IMMUNOGLOBULIN-FC-REGION | [2016/43] | English: | LIPIDATED INCRETIN RECEPTOR LIGAND HUMAN IMMUNOGLOBULIN FC-REGION FUSION POLYPEPTIDES | [2016/43] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE FUSION LIGAND LIPIDÉ DU RÉCEPTEUR DE L'INCRÉTINE - RÉGION FC D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE HUMAINE | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 17.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009155258 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * abstract; claims 1-104; pages 2-17, 33-87, 108-126; Examples 2, 21, 22; Tables 22 and 23 *; | [ID]WO2010011439 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [ID] 1-30 * abstract; claims 1-8, 14, 15, 22, 25-29, 31-33; pages 1-13, 30-41, 52-54, 56, 57, 65, 69, 70, 73, 74 *; | [IP]WO2013192131 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [IP] 1-30 * claims 1-37; pages 1-25, 33-36 and 49-52 *; | [IP]WO2013192130 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [IP] 1-30 * Seq. ID Nos 13, 142, 147, 148, 158, 167, 175, 181; claims 1-57; paragraphs [0077]-[0097]; pages 60, 105, 106 * | [I] - WOLFGANG GLAESNER ET AL, "Engineering and characterization of the long-acting glucagon-like peptide-1 analogue LY2189265, an Fc fusion protein", DIABETES/METABOLISM RESEARCH AND REVIEWS, (20100430), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:10.1002/dmrr.1080, ISSN 1520-7552, pages 287 - 296, XP055181624 [I] 1-10,17-30 * abstract; pages 288, 290, 291, 293, 295; Figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dmrr.1080 | [IDA] - B. FINAN ET AL, "Unimolecular Dual Incretins Maximize Metabolic Benefits in Rodents, Monkeys, and Humans", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, (20131030), vol. 5, no. 209, doi:10.1126/scitranslmed.3007218, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 209ra151 - 209ra151, XP055154610 [ID] 11 * abstract; pages 2, 5, 6, 11, 12; Table 1 * [A] 1-10,12-30 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3007218 | [I] - "Human glucagon analog peptide SEQ: 1120.", Geneseq, (20130718), Database accession no. BAO89973, URL: EBI, XP002738200 [I] 11 * the whole document * | [A] - BRIAN P. WARD ET AL, "Peptide lipidation stabilizes structure to enhance biological function", MOLECULAR METABOLISM, (20130905), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.molmet.2013.08.008, ISSN 2212-8778, pages 468 - 479, XP055180976 [A] 1-30 * abstract; Table 1, pages 468, 472-477 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmet.2013.08.008 | [A] - DAVID A LEVARY ET AL, "Protein-Protein Fusion Catalyzed by Sortase A", vol. 6, no. 4, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0018342, ISSN 1932-6203, (20110401), pages e18342.1 - e18342.6, PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, URL: http://www.plosone.org/article/info%3Adoi%2F10.1371%2Fjournal.pone.0018342, (20110406), XP002686608 [A] 5 * the whole document, in particular figures 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0018342 | [A] - H LIU, "N-acetyl-GLP-1: a DPP IV-resistant analogue of glucagon-like peptide-1 (GLP-1) with improved effects on pancreatic [beta]-cell-associated gene expression", CELL BIOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (20040101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.cellbi.2003.10.004, ISSN 1065-6995, pages 69 - 73, XP055181637 [A] 13-16 * abstract; pages 69/70 (introduction), 71 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cellbi.2003.10.004 | by applicant | WO2010011439 | US6329336 | US7153825 | US5574008 | US5424286 | US6514500 | US6821949 | US6887849 | US6849714 | US6924264 | WO03103572 | US6593295 | WO2011109784 | US5648260 | US5624821 | US6586207 | WO9848032 | WO03073238 | US2004214988 | WO2005035727 | WO2005074524 | US7355008 | US7381408 | US4816567 | US5648237 | US5789199 | US5840523 | US5959177 | US6040498 | US6420548 | US7125978 | US6417429 | US2005260186 | US2006104968 | US6267958 | US6171586 | WO2006044908 | - FORTIN, J-P. ET AL., PLOSONE, (2011), vol. 6, page E24693 | - FINAN, B. ET AL., "report that unimolecular dual incretins maximize metabolic benefits in rodents, monkeys, and humans", SCI. TRANSL. MED., (2013), vol. 5, page 209RA151 | - ELLMAN ET AL., METH. ENZYM, (1991), vol. 202, pages 301 - 336 | - NOREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 244, page 182 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492 | - BURTON, MOL. IMMUNOL., (1985), vol. 22, pages 161 - 206 | - DALL'ACQUA, BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 37, pages 9266 - 9273 | - HUBER ET AL., NATURE, (1976), vol. 264, pages 415 - 420 | - THIES ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 293, pages 67 - 79 | - ANTHONY, R.M. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 320, pages 373 - 376 | - EDELMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1969), vol. 63, pages 78 - 85 | - CHIN, J.W. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2002), vol. 124, pages 9026 - 9027 | - CHIN, J.W.; SCHULTZ, P.G., CHEMBIOCHEM, (2002), vol. 11, pages 1135 - 1137 | - CHIN, J.W. ET AL., PICAS UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 11020 - 11024 | - WANG, L.; SCHULTZ, P.G., CHEM., (2002), pages 1 - 10 | - DAËRON, M., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 203 - 234 | - RAVETCH; KINET, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL, (1991), vol. 9, pages 457 - 492 | - CAPEL ET AL., IMMUNOMETHODS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 25 - 34 | - DE HAAS ET AL., J. LAB. CLIN. MED., (1995), vol. 126, pages 330 - 341 | - GUYER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 117, page 587 | - KIM ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 249 | - DAVIS ET AL., IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (2002), vol. 190, pages 123 - 136 | - JEFFERIS ET AL., IMMUNOL. LETT., (2002), vol. 82, pages 57 - 65 | - SONDERMANN ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 406, pages 267 - 273 | - ROUTLEDGE ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1995), vol. 60, page 847 | - FRIEND ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (1999), vol. 68, page 1632 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - WARD; GHETIE, THER. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 2, page 77 | - ARMOUR ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604 | - ROUX ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, page 4083 | - DALL'ACQUA, W.F. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, pages 23514 - 23524 | - PETKOVA, S.B. ET AL., INTERNAT. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, pages 1759 - 1769 | - VACCARO, C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2007), vol. 103, pages 18709 - 18714 | - VICTOR, G. ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 637 - 640 | - DALL'ACQUA, W.F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, pages 5171 - 5180 | - CARTER ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 4431 - 4443 | - KUNKEL ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 488 | - HIGUCHI, PCR Protocols, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1990), pages 177 - 183 | - VALLETTE ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1989), vol. 17, pages 723 - 733 | - WELLS ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 34, pages 315 - 323 | - CLANCY, K.W. ET AL., PEPTIDE SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 94, pages 385 - 396 | - DZHURA, I. ET AL., ISLETS, (2011), vol. 3, pages 121 - 128 | - EHSES, J.A. ET AL., ENDOCRIN, (2003), vol. 144, pages 4433 - 4445 | - KANG, G. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 8279 - 8285 | - MIURA, Y.; MATSUI, H., TOX. APPL. PHARMACOL., (2006), vol. 216, pages 363 - 372 | - MUKAI, E. ET AL., DIABETES, (2011), vol. 60, pages 218 - 226 | - NATALICCHIO, A. ET AL., ENDOCRIN, (2010), vol. 151, pages 2019 - 2029 | - QUOYER, J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2010), vol. 285, pages 1989 - 2002 | - UHLES, S. ET AL., DIABETES OBES. METABOL., (2010), vol. 13, pages 326 - 336 | - BURCELIN, R. ET AL., DIABETES, (2001), vol. 50, pages 1720 - 1728 | - VAHL, T.P. ET AL., ENDOCRIN., (2007), vol. 148, pages 4965 - 4973 | - SANDOVAL, D.A. ET AL., DIABETES, (2008), vol. 57, pages 2046 - 2054 | - HAYES, M.R. ET AL., ENDOCRINOL., (2009), vol. 150, pages 2654 - 2659 | - MCMAHON, L.R.; WELLMAN, P.J., AM. J. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 274, pages R23 - 29 | - TURTON, M.D. ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 379, pages 69 - 72 | - FIGUEIREDO, C.P. ET AL., BEHAV. PHARMACOL., (2010), vol. 21, pages 394 - 408 | - NYBERG, J. ET AL., J. NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 25, pages 1816 - 1825 | - GETTY-KUSHIK, L. ET AL., OBESITY, (2006), vol. 14, pages 1124 - 1131 | - KIM, S.J. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2007), vol. 282, pages 8557 - 8567 | - KIM, S.J. ET AL., J. LIPID RES., (2010), vol. 51, pages 3145 - 3157 | - CHARLTON, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 245 - 254 | - GERNGROSS, NAT. BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - LI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH, (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, no. 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - LTEIF; MATHER, CAN. J. CARDIOL., (2004), vol. 20, no. B, pages 66B - 76B | - WORMAN, HOWARD J., Alcoholic Liver Disease, COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER | - MEISSNER, P. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG, (2001), vol. 75, pages 197 - 203 | - PACE, PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 4, pages 2411 - 2423 |