EP3029632 - VEHICULAR IMAGE RECOGNITION SYSTEM FOR DISPLAY-BOARD RECOGNITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2021 [2021/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLk Technologies Co. Ltd. 1201ho Yangpyeong-dong 3-ga Yangpyeong-dong INNOPLEX Bldg 57-5 Yangsan-ro Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-103 / KR | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Kwang Il 101-1308 Dongbu Apt. 1695 Shinwon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-783 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Sang Mook 101-1011 Hyundai Baekjo Apt. Ogeum-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-855 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jin Hyuck 117-1502 Mullae Xi Apt. 54 Mullae-dong 3-ga Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-993 / KR | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Straße 42 80335 München / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14831532.8 | 01.05.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014KR03902 | Priority number, date | KR20130090630 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130090630 | [2016/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015016461 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3029632 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, H04N5/232 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
G06V20/582 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/54 (KR,US);
H04N23/72 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/73 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/74 (KR,US);
H04N23/743 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/76 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGBILDERKENNUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ANZEIGETAFELERKENNUNG | [2016/23] | English: | VEHICULAR IMAGE RECOGNITION SYSTEM FOR DISPLAY-BOARD RECOGNITION | [2016/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RECONNAISSANCE D'IMAGES POUR VÉHICULE PERMETTANT UNE RECONNAISSANCE DE PANNEAUX D'AFFICHAGE | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2015 | Translation filed | 10.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/03] | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010172542 (STEIN GIDEON [IL], et al); | [A]US2012002053 (STEIN GIDEON P [IL], et al) | International search | [A]JP2010148130 (ELBIT SYSTEMS LTD); | [A]KR20130030667 (CHOI JAE SOON [KR], et al); | [X]KR101259836B ; | [A]KR20130052334 (UNIV SOGANG RES FOUNDATION [KR]) |