EP3029069 - ANTI-HUMAN CD26 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY OR ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juntendo Educational Foundation 2-1-1, Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIMOTO, Chikao c/o Juntendo University 2-1-1 Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | 02 /
HATANO, Ryo c/o Juntendo University 2-1-1 Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Taketo 2-1-26 Takaido Higashi Suginami-ku Tokyo 168-0072 / JP | 04 /
OHNUMA, Kei c/o Juntendo University 2-1-1 Hongo Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8421 / JP | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14831681.3 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014JP70084 | Priority number, date | JP20130158533 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013158533 | [2016/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015016267 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029069 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3029069 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/40, C12N5/10, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, G01N33/577, C12N15/09, C12P21/08, G01N33/569, G01N33/564 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C12N5/163 (EP,US);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/57419 (EP,US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/577 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
G01N2333/70596 (EP,US);
G01N2333/948 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | C07K16/28, C07K16/40, C12N5/10, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, G01N33/577, C12N15/09, C12P21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONOKLONALER ANTI-HUMAN-CD26-ANTIKÖRPER ODER ANTIGENBINDENDES FRAGMENT DAVON | [2016/23] | English: | ANTI-HUMAN CD26 MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY OR ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENT THEREOF | [2016/23] | French: | ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL ANTI-CD26 HUMAIN, OU SON FRAGMENT DE LIAISON À L'ANTIGÈNE | [2016/23] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2016 | Translation filed | 11.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 06.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 02.10.2019 | AT | 02.10.2019 | CY | 02.10.2019 | CZ | 02.10.2019 | DK | 02.10.2019 | EE | 02.10.2019 | ES | 02.10.2019 | FI | 02.10.2019 | HR | 02.10.2019 | IT | 02.10.2019 | LT | 02.10.2019 | LV | 02.10.2019 | MC | 02.10.2019 | MK | 02.10.2019 | MT | 02.10.2019 | NL | 02.10.2019 | PL | 02.10.2019 | RO | 02.10.2019 | RS | 02.10.2019 | SE | 02.10.2019 | SI | 02.10.2019 | SK | 02.10.2019 | SM | 02.10.2019 | TR | 02.10.2019 | BG | 02.01.2020 | NO | 02.01.2020 | GR | 03.01.2020 | IS | 02.02.2020 | PT | 03.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 02.10.2019 | ||
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CY | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
MT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
TR | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
MC | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SI | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
IT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
SK | 02.10.2019 | ||
SM | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
DK | 02.10.2019 | ||
EE | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
IS | 02.02.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RO | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 02.10.2019 | |
AT | 02.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
CZ | 02.10.2019 | ||
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
HR | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
RS | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 02.10.2019 | |
ES | 02.10.2019 | ||
FI | 02.10.2019 | ||
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
LV | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
PL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
GR | 03.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 02.10.2019 | |
LT | 02.10.2019 | ||
NL | 02.10.2019 | ||
SE | 02.10.2019 | ||
BG | 02.01.2020 | ||
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
PT | 03.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 02.10.2019 | |
NO | 02.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 02.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007014169 (Y S THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * examples 5-11; par. 248, 251-252 *; | [XP] - RYO HATANO ET AL, "Establishment of monoclonal anti-human CD26 antibodies suitable for immunostaining of formalin-fixed tissue", DIAGNOSTIC PATHOLOGY, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LO, (20140206), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1746-1596-9-30, ISSN 1746-1596, page 30, XP021178896 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1746-1596-9-30 | [Y] - VISHWA AMATYA, "Overexpression of CD26/DPPIV in mesothelioma tissue and mesothelioma cell lines", ONCOLOGY REPORTS, (20110905), vol. 26, doi:10.3892/or.2011.1449, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 1369 - 1375, XP055322123 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/or.2011.1449 | [Y] - OORD VAN DEN J J, "EXPRESSION OF CD26/DIPEPTIDYL-PEPTIDASE IV IN BENIGN AND MALIGNANT PIGMENT-CELL LESIONS OF THE SKIN", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, OXFORD : WILEY-BLACKWELL, UK, (19980401), vol. 138, doi:10.1046/J.1365-2133.1998.02171.X, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 615 - 621, XP002944502 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; p. 615 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2133.1998.02171.x | International search | [Y]JP2009502139 (Y'S THERAPEUTICS, CO., LTD.); | [Y] - DONG R-.P. ET AL., "Correlation of the epitopes defined by anti- CD 26 mAbs and CD 26 function", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 35, pages 13 - 21, XP055313946 | [Y] - HUHN J. ET AL., "The Adenosine Deaminase-Binding Region Is Distinct from Major Anti- CD 26 mAb Epitopes on the Human Dipeptidyl Peptidase IV, (CD 26) Molecule", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1999), vol. 192, pages 33 - 40, XP055313948 | [Y] - ABBOTT C. A. ET AL., "Binding to human dipeptidyl peptidase IV by adenosine deaminase and antibodies that inhibit ligand binding involves overlapping, discontinuous sites on a predicted propeller domain", EUR. J. BIOCHEM, (1999), vol. 266, pages 798 - 810, XP055313950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1432-1327.1999.00902.x | [Y] - ULMER A. J. ET AL., "CD 26 Antigen is a Surface Dipeptidyl Peptidase IV (DPPIV) as Characterized by Monoclonal Antibodies Clone TII-19-4-7 and 4EL1C7", SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 31, pages 429 - 435, XP001048107 | by applicant | US4816567 | US5565332 | US5580717 | US5733743 | US6265150 | WO02092127 | WO2007014169 | WO2008114876 | - FOX DA; HUSSEY RE; FITZGERALD KA ET AL., "Tal, a novel 105 KD human T cell activation antigen defined by a monoclonal antibody", J IMMUNOL, (1984), vol. 133, pages 1250 - 1256 | - TANAKA T; CAMERINI D; SEED B ET AL., "Cloning and functional expression of the T cell activation antigen CD26", J IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 149, pages 481 - 486, XP001038740 | - OHNUMA K; DANG NH; MORIMOTO C, "Revisiting an old acquaintance: CD26 and its molecular mechanisms in T cell function", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/j.it.2008.02.010, pages 295 - 301, XP022701231 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2008.02.010 | - MORIMOTO C; SCHLOSSMAN SF, "The structure and function of CD26 in the T-cell immune response", IMMUNOL REV, (1998), vol. 161, pages 55 - 70 | - DANG NH; TORIMOTO Y; SUGITA K ET AL., "Cell surface modulation of CD26 by anti-1F7 monoclonal antibody. Analysis of surface expression and human T cell activation", J IMMUNOL, (1990), vol. 145, pages 3963 - 3971 | - MASUYAMA J; YOSHIO T; SUZUKI K ET AL., "Characterization of the 4C8 antigen involved in transendothelial migration of CD26hi T cells after tight adhesion to human umbilical vein endothelial cell monolayers", J EXP MED, (1999), vol. 189, pages 979 - 990 | - OHNUMA K; INOUE H; UCHIYAMA M ET AL., "T-cell activation via CD26 and caveolin-1 in rheumatoid synovium", MOD RHEUMATOL, (2006), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1007/s10165-005-0452-4, pages 3 - 13, XP019375207 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10165-005-0452-4 | - HATANO R; OHNUMA K; YAMAMOTO J; DANG NH; MORIMOTO C, "CD26-mediated co-stimulation in human CD8+ T cells provokes effector function via pro-inflammatory cytokine production", IMMUNOLOGY, (2013), vol. 138, doi:doi:10.1111/imm.12028, pages 165 - 172, XP055436603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/imm.12028 | - HATANO R; OHNUMA K; YAMAMOTO J; DANG NH; YAMADA T; MORIMOTO C, "Prevention of acute graft-versus-host disease by humanized anti-CD26 monoclonal antibody", BR J HAEMATOL, (2013), vol. 162, pages 263 - 277 | - HAVRE PA; ABE M; URASAKI Y; OHNUMA K; MORIMOTO C; DANG NH, "The role of CD26/dipeptidyl peptidase IV in cancer", FRONT BIOSCI, (2008), vol. 13, pages 1634 - 1645 | - UMIO YAMAGUCHI ET AL., "Distinct Gene Expression-Defined Classes of Gastrointestinal Stromal Tumor", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (2008), vol. 26, no. 25, pages 4100 - 4108 | - INAMOTO T; YAMADA T; OHNUMA K ET AL., "Humanized anti-CD26 monoclonal antibody as a treatment for malignant mesothelioma tumors", CLIN CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0110, pages 4191 - 4200, XP008116674 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-0110 | - AOE K; AMATYA VJ; FUJIMOTO N ET AL., "CD26 overexpression is associated with prolonged survival and enhanced chemosensitivity in malignant pleural mesothelioma", CLIN CANCER RES, (2012), vol. 18, pages 1447 - 1456 | - AL-LAZIKANI ET AL., J. MOLEC. BIOL., (1997), vol. 273, pages 927 - 948 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - TORIGOE T., "Establishment of a monoclonal anti-pan HLA class I antibody suitable for immunostaining of formalin-fixed tissue: usually high frequency of down-regulation in breast cancer tissue", PATHOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (2012), vol. 62, pages 303 - 308 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., J. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - CARTER ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - STERNBERGER LA ET AL., "The unlabeled antibody enzyme method of immunohistochemistry: preparation and properties of soluble antigen-antibody complex (horseradish peroxidase-antihorseradish peroxidase) and its use in identification of spirochetes", J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (1970), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 315 - 33, XP000672174 | - HSU SM; RAINE L; FANGER H, "Use of avidin-biotin-peroxidase complex (ABC) in immunoperoxidase techniques: a comparison between ABC and unlabeled antibody (PAP) procedures", J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (1981), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 577 - 80 | - GRAHAM RC JR; KARNOVSKY MJ, "The early stages of absorption of injected horseradish peroxidase in the proximal tubules of mouse kidney: ultrastructural cytochemistry by a new technique", J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (1966), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 291 - 302, XP009111547 | - DONG RP; TACHIBANA K; HEGEN M ET AL., "Correlation of the epitopes defined by anti-CD26 mAbs and CD26 function", MOL IMMUNOL, (1998), vol. 35, pages 13 - 21, XP055313946 | - MORIMOTO C ET AL., "1F7, A novel cell surface molecule, involved in helper function of CD4 cells", J IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 143, pages 3430 - 3439 | - TORIMOTO Y ET AL., "Biochemical characterization of CD26 (dipeptidyl peptidase IV): Functional comparison of distinct epitopes recognized by various anti-CD26 monoclonal antibodies", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0161-5890(92)90099-J, pages 183 - 192, XP023683117 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0161-5890(92)90099-J | - TANAKA T; DUKE-COHAN JS; KAMEOKA J ET AL., "Enhancement of antigen-induced T-cell proliferation by soluble CD26/dipeptidyl peptidase IV", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1994), vol. 91, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.91.8.3082, pages 3082 - 3086, XP000579867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.8.3082 | - TANAKA T; KAMEOKA J; YARON A; SCHLOSSMAN SF; MORIMOTO C, "The costimulatory activity of the CD26 antigen requires dipeptidyl peptidase IV enzymatic activity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (1993), vol. 90, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.90.10.4586, pages 4586 - 4590, XP002993053 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.10.4586 |