EP3028403 - HOME APPLIANCE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Si Hyun 55 Gwongwang-ro Gwonseon-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 441-768 / KR | 02 /
TALIPOV, Elmurod 35 Itaewon-ro 26-gil Yongsan-gu Seoul 140-865 / KR | 03 /
YU, Dal Young 363 Hyowon-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-751 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Hoon 22 Gukhoe-daero 37-gil Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-806 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Young Woon 36 Gwongwang-ro 260beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-710 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Jae Seok 47 Cheongnyang-ro 185beon-gil Yeonsu-gu Incheon 406-050 / KR | 07 /
CHOI, Jae Seung 64 Jungdong-ro Sosa-gu Bucheon-si Gyeonggi-do 422-762 / KR | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14831919.7 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014KR06989 | Priority number, date | KR20130090163 | 30.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130090163 | KR20130152888 | 10.12.2013 Original published format: KR 20130152888 | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015016604 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3028403 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3028403 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04M1/725, H04W4/20, H04L29/06, H04W12/00, // H04W4/00 | [2019/48] | CPC: |
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (KR);
H04M1/72415 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (KR);
H04L12/2834 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US);
H04L63/0492 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/10] | H04L12/28, H04M1/725, H04W4/20, H04L29/06, // H04W4/00, H04W4/22 | ||
Former IPC [2016/23] | H04L12/12, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2016/23] | English: | HOME APPLIANCE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREOF | [2016/23] | French: | APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.03.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | IE | 30.07.2020 | LU | 30.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 30.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004116941 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]WO2007138379 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 1, line 16 - line 28 * * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 14 * * page 3, line 1 - line 35 * * page 4, line 3 - line 8 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 31 * * page 8, line 36 - page 9, line 8 * * page 9, line 21 - line 36 * * page 10, line 25 - line 28 * * page 11, line 1 - line 9 * * page 11, line 18 - line 35 * * page 13, line 21 - line 27 * * page 14, line 1 - line 4 * * page 14, line 27 - page 15, line 2 * * page 15, line 33 - page 16, line 1 * * page 16, line 14 - line 26 * [I] 1-15; | [I]US2008254746 (KRISHNAN SUMITHRA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] * | International search | [A]US2004114734 (YOON SANG CHUL [KR], et al); | [A]US2006252457 (SCHRAGER MARTIN [US]); | [A]US2007240200 (HAN HEE-CHUL [KR]); | [A]US2010040213 (PARK HYUNG JUN [KR], et al); | [A]US2012276891 (BAI CHUNSHENG [CN]) | Examination | US2010151833 | by applicant | WO2007138379 | US2008254746 | US2010151833 |