Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3027758
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.11.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
04.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.08.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.06.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
08.05.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.12.2017 |
First examination report |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2017 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
07.10.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
04.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
06.05.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
19.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|