EP3027758 - PROCESS FOR THE ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novozymes A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Yongming 537 Moultonboro Avenue Wake Forest, North Carolina 27587 / US | 02 /
HOLMES, Jason 77 Perry Chapel Church Road P.O. Box 576 Franklinton, North Carolina 27525 / US | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | NZ EPO Representatives Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Shenker, Paul Dhan Novozymes A/S Patents Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsværd / DK | Application number, filing date | 14832135.9 | 13.08.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014US50844 | Priority number, date | US201361861139P | 01.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361861139 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015017869 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027758 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/14 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
C12P7/10 (EP,US);
C08B37/0057 (EP,US);
C08H8/00 (EP,US);
C12P19/02 (EP,US);
C12P19/14 (EP,US);
C13K1/02 (EP,US);
C12P2201/00 (EP,US);
C12P2203/00 (EP,US);
D21C5/005 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENZYMATISCHEN UMWANDLUNG VON LIGNOCELLULOSEBIOMASSE | [2016/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE ENZYMATIC CONVERSION OF LIGNOCELLULOSIC BIOMASS | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION ENZYMATIQUE D'UNE BIOMASSE LIGNOCELLULOSIQUE | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 05.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/51] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 30.03.2016 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2012135506 (HEISKANEN ISTO [FI], et al) [AD] 1-12 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]US2013052696 (UEYAMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-4 * | [A] - PAAKKO M ET AL, "Enzymatic Hydrolysis Combined with Mechanical Shearing and High-Pressure Homogenization for Nanoscale Cellulose Fibrils and Strong Gels", BIOMACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 8, doi:10.1021/BM061215P, ISSN 1525-7797, (20070101), pages 1934 - 1941, (20070503), XP003026928 [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1940, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BM061215P | International search | [Y]US2013137147 (LALI ARVIND MALLINATH [IN], et al); | [Y]US2011008863 (ZHU YONGMING [US], et al); | [Y]US2011207177 (SUGIURA JUN [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012040080 (HAWKINS ANDREW C [US], et al); | [A]US2010086981 (LATOUF WILLIAM G [US], et al); | [XP]WO2014075694 (INBICON AS [DK]) |