EP3027369 - PORTABLE ROBOTIC CASTING OF VOLUMETRIC MODULAR BUILDING COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mccaffrey, Richard J. 505 Haddington Circle Inverness, IL 60010 / US | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14832582.2 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014US48734 | Priority number, date | US201361859710P | 29.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361859710 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015017461 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3027369 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/22, E04G21/16, E04B1/348, E04G11/02 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
E04G11/02 (EP,US);
E04G19/00 (US);
E04B1/34823 (EP,US);
E04G21/168 (EP,US);
E04B2001/34892 (EP,US);
E04G11/20 (US);
G05B2219/45211 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | B28B7/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ROBOTISCHE GUSSFORM FÜR MODULARE VOLUMETRISCHE BAUTEILE | [2016/23] | English: | PORTABLE ROBOTIC CASTING OF VOLUMETRIC MODULAR BUILDING COMPONENTS | [2016/23] | French: | COULÉE ROBOTISÉE PORTATIVE D'ÉLÉMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION MODULAIRES VOLUMÉTRIQUES | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 12.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2903777 (MITCHELL EARL C) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-7 * [A] 4-6; | [X]US3680824 (KESTING LORENZ) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 40; figures 1-7 *; | [XA]IL39576 (MODULBAU AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 5, line 11 - line 20; figures 3-5 * * page 11, line 19 - page 14, line 31 * [A] 5; | [XA]FR2455964 (KESTING LORENZ [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 8, line 5 - column 9, line 22; figures 1-4 *[A] 4,5 | International search | [Y]GB807153 (TARMAC LTD) [Y] 1-8 * entire document *; | [Y]FR1282656 (ENTPR S BALENCY & SCHUHL SA DE) [Y] 1-8 * see machine translation *; | [Y]US5238379 (PAYNE LEROY [US]) [Y] 1-8 * entire document *; | [A]US5667192 (VAN DOREN DAVID A [US]) [A] 1-8* entire document * |