EP3029651 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING TRAFFIC INFORMATION USING LOCAL AREA COMMUNICATION, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hakseong 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Byounghoon 19 Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-893 / KR | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14832636.6 | 04.08.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014KR07178 | Priority number, date | US201361861434P | 02.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361861434 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015016689 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029651 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967, G08G1/01, H04L29/08, G01C21/36, H04W8/00, H04W4/02 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
G01C21/3694 (US);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | G08G1/0967, G08G1/01, H04W4/04, H04W8/00, G01C21/36, H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2016/23] | G08G1/01, H04W4/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN VON VERKEHRSINFORMATIONEN DURCH NAHBEREICHSKOMMUNIKATION UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD FOR OBTAINING TRAFFIC INFORMATION USING LOCAL AREA COMMUNICATION, AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION D'INFORMATIONS DE TRAFIC AU MOYEN DE COMMUNICATIONS LOCALES ET APPAREIL POUR CELUI-CI | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2016 | Translation filed | 12.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 29.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2020 | 05.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 07.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2009082950 (VORONA DIMITRI [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0075] * [A] 2-5,7-10; | [A]US2011071756 (STAEHLIN ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2013099941 (JANA RITTWIK [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0071] * | International search | [Y]KR20050122579 (FINEDIGITAL [KR]); | [A]KR20080051304 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20100107800 (MYONGJI UNIV IND & ACAD COOP [KR]); | [A]US2012265818 (VAN PHAN VINH [FI], et al); | [Y]WO2013012222 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) |