EP2999289 - TERMINAL FOR SUPPORTING DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Kyeongin No.102-1301 455-17 Dongbaekjukjeon-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-707 / KR | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14832737.2 | 31.07.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014KR07077 | Priority number, date | KR20130091180 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: KR 20130091180 | [2016/12] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015016646 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | KO | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999289 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999289 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/14, H04W72/02, H04W28/02 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W28/0278 (RU,US);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04W72/02 (EP,RU,US);
H04W80/02 (KR);
H04W88/02 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | H04W80/02, H04W88/02, H04W72/02, H04W76/02, H04W28/02 | ||
Former IPC [2016/12] | H04W72/12, H04W80/02, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDGERÄT ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG VON VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG-KOMMUNIKATION UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON | [2016/12] | English: | TERMINAL FOR SUPPORTING DEVICE TO DEVICE COMMUNICATION AND METHOD FOR OPERATING SAME | [2016/12] | French: | TERMINAL POUR PRISE EN CHARGE DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2015 | Translation filed | 15.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19197760.2 / EP3609290 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2014 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.07.2014 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]WO2012144320 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11,14,15 * abstract * [A] 4,13 [Y] 9 [I] 3,12; | US2016113001 [ ] (IWAMURA MIKIO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0033] * * figure 3 *; | [XAY]US2012207100 (HAKOLA SAMI-JUKKA [FI], et al) [X] 1-4,10-13,15 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0125] * * figures 4-6 * [A] 14 [Y] 5-9; | [XPAY]GB2507490 (BROADCOM CORP [US]) [XP] 1-3,5,11,12,14,15 * page 1 - page 2, line 4 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 15 * * page 9, line 26 - page 13, line 2 * * figure 3a * [A] 4,10,13 [Y] 6-9,15; | [YA]WO2013044718 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 5,6,14,15 * abstract * [A] 1-4,7-13; | [YPA]EP2741563 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [YP] 6-9,15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * [A] 1-5,10-14; | [YA]US2013157669 (TURTINEN SAMULI [FI], et al) [Y] 5-7,14,15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0047] * [A] 1-4,8-13; | [XAY] - BALAJI RAGHOTHAMAN ET AL, "Architecture and protocols for LTE-based device to device communication", 2013 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS (ICNC 2013) : SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, 28 - 31 JANUARY 2013, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20130128), doi:10.1109/ICCNC.2013.6504208, ISBN 978-1-4673-5287-1, pages 895 - 899, XP032377019 [X] 1-3,10-12 * abstract * * Section II.B * * figure 2 * [A] 4,13 [Y] 5-9,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCNC.2013.6504208 | [XPA] - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "BSR for D2D", vol. RAN WG2, no. Seoul, Korea; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140518), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-142587_D2DBSRDDRB-V01, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140518), XP050793679 [XP] 1,5-11,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 2-4,12,13 | [A] - JAAKKO SEPPALA ET AL, "Network controlled Device-to-Device (D2D) and cluster multicast concept for LTE and LTE-A networks", 2011 IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE (WCNC 2011) : CANCUN, MEXICO, 28 - 31 MARCH 2011, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, (20110328), doi:10.1109/WCNC.2011.5779270, ISBN 978-1-61284-255-4, pages 986 - 991, XP031876390 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section II-A to II-F; Section III-A * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2011.5779270 | [YPA] - CATT, "D2D Communication Resource Allocation Mode 1", vol. RAN WG2, no. Valencia, Spain; 20140331 - 20140404, (20140322), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-141195, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140322), XP050792432 [YP] 5-7,9,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,8,10-13 | International search | [A]KR20120074254 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]US2012207100 (HAKOLA SAMI-JUKKA [FI], et al); | [A]KR20130063644 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A]KR20130065373 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]); | [A] - BALAJI RAGHOTHAMAN ET AL., "Architecture and protocols for LTE-based device to device communication", COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS (ICNC), 2013 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, pages 895 - 899, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stainp/stampjsp?tp=&arnumber=6504208, XP032377019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCNC.2013.6504208 | Examination | US2009016225 | US2013178221 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.321, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20130629), vol. RAN WG2, no. V11.3.0, pages 1 - 57, XP050712004 | - XIAOYUE ZHU ET AL, "QoS-based resource allocation scheme for Device-to-Device (D2D) radio underlaying cellular networks", TELECOMMUNICATIONS (ICT), 2012 19TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120423), doi:10.1109/ICTEL.2012.6221213, ISBN 978-1-4673-0745-1, pages 1 - 6, XP032188277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICTEL.2012.6221213 |