EP3029464 - METHOD FOR ASSESSING AUTOIMMUNE ARTHRITIS, AND SCREENING METHOD FOR SUBSTANCES INHIBITING ACTIVITY OF AUTOIMMUNE ARTHRITIS-INDUCING T CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2019 [2019/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGUCHI, Shimon c/o KYOTO UNIVERSITY 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Yoshinaga c/o KYOTO UNIVERSITY 36-1 Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/23] | Application number, filing date | 14832954.3 | 22.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014JP69306 | Priority number, date | JP20130159815 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013159815 | [2016/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015016096 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029464 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, C07K14/47, G01N33/50, G01N33/569 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
G01N33/6854 (US);
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N2500/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | G01N33/564, C07K14/47, C12Q1/02, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/53, C12N15/09 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG VON AUTOIMMUNARTHRITIS UND SCREENINGVERFAHREN FÜR STOFFE ALS INHIBITOREN DER AKTIVITÄT VON AUTOIMMUNARTHRITIS-INDUZIERENDEN T-ZELLEN | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSESSING AUTOIMMUNE ARTHRITIS, AND SCREENING METHOD FOR SUBSTANCES INHIBITING ACTIVITY OF AUTOIMMUNE ARTHRITIS-INDUCING T CELLS | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVALUER L'ARTHRITE AUTO-IMMUNE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CRIBLAGE POUR DES SUBSTANCES INHIBANT L'ACTIVITÉ DE CELLULES T INDUISANT L'ARTHRITE AUTO-IMMUNE | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2016 | Translation filed | 29.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 15.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/28] | 25.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003224386 (GUILD BRAYDON C [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008107668 (PHILIP RAMILA [US], et al) [X] 11 * abstract * * page 5; table 2 * * claim 1 * * SEQ ID NO: 8 *; | [X]WO2009036246 (IMMUNOTOPE INC [US], et al) [X] 11 * abstract * * page 38; table 2 * * claim 1 * * SEQ ID NOs: 5 and 7 *; | [A]WO2009138408 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [T] - ITO Y. ET AL., "Detection of T cell responses to a ubiquitous cellular protein in autoimmune disease", SCIENCE, (20141017), vol. 346, no. 6207, pages 363 - 368, XP055337702 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1259077 | International search | [A]WO9815173 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al); | [X]US2008107668 (PHILIP RAMILA [US], et al); | [X]WO2009036246 (IMMUNOTOPE INC [US], et al) | by applicant | JP3467520B | - COURTENAY JS; DALLMAN MJ; DAYAN AD; MARTIN A; MOSEDALE B, "Immunisation against heterologous type II collagen induces arthritis in mice", NATURE, (1980), vol. 283, pages 666 - 8 | - KOUSKOFF, V. ET AL., "Organ-specific disease provoked by systemic autoimmunity", CELL, (1996), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81989-3, pages 811 - 822, XP002155989 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)81989-3 | - MATSUMOTO, I.; STAUB, A.; BENOIST, C; MATHIS, D, "Arthritis provoked by linked T and B cell recognition of a glycolytic enzyme", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 286, doi:doi:10.1126/science.286.5445.1732, pages 1732 - 1735, XP000941603 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.286.5445.1732 | - SAKAGUCHI, N. ET AL., "Altered thymic T-cell selection due to a mutation of the ZAP-70 gene causes autoimmune arthritis in mice", NATURE, (2003), vol. 426, pages 454 - 460 | - HIROTA, K ET AL., "T cell self-reactivity forms a cytokine milieu for spontaneous development of IL-17+ Th cells that cause autoimmune arthritis", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, (2007), vol. 204, pages 41 - 47 | - LENNON, G. P. ET AL., "T cell islet accumulation in type 1 diabetes is a tightly regulated, cell-autonomous event", IMMUNITY, (2009), vol. 31, pages 643 - 653 |