EP3233442 - COATING OF PARTS OR OBJECTS AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferro, Emiliano Via Monte Cereo 48 35030 Rovolon (PD) / IT | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Vinci, Marcello Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116 35141 Padova / IT | [2017/43] | Application number, filing date | 14833393.3 | 19.12.2014 | [2017/43] | WO2014IB67118 | Priority number, date | IT2014PD00347 | 18.12.2014 Original published format: IT PD20140347 | [2017/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016097825 | Date: | 23.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3233442 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/78, B29C45/14, B32B5/26, B32B9/00, B32B9/02, B32B9/04, B32B21/04, B32B21/10, B32B21/14, B32B27/08, B32B27/12, B32B27/30, B32B27/36, B32B1/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B32B21/14 (EP,US);
B29C45/14811 (EP,US);
B32B1/00 (EP,US);
B32B21/04 (EP,US);
B32B21/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B32B37/06 (US);
B32B38/0004 (US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
B32B9/002 (EP,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,US);
B32B9/045 (EP,US);
B32B9/047 (EP,US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,US);
B29C70/028 (EP,US);
B29C70/78 (EP,US);
B29K2711/08 (EP,US);
B29K2711/14 (EP,US);
B29K2713/00 (EP,US);
B32B2038/042 (US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2451/00 (EP,US);
B32B2605/003 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNG VON TEILEN ODER GEGENSTÄNDEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/43] | English: | COATING OF PARTS OR OBJECTS AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING IT | [2017/43] | French: | REVÊTEMENT DE PIÈCES OU D'OBJETS ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'OBTENTION | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 21.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/49] | 29.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0045421 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-10 * figure 7 * * page 10, line 12 - line 31 *; | [A]US4931324 (ELLISON THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 ** column 5, line 42 - line 52 *; | [X]WO9403337 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,4-6,10 * figures 1-4 * * page 10, line 15 - line 24 * * page 1, line 8 - line 9 * * page 21, line 11 - line 13 * * page 15, line 7 - line 8 * * page 18, line 12 - line 15 * * page 16, line 32 - line 34 * * page 20, line 4 - line 19 * * page 20, line 24 - line 31 * * page 21, line 14 - line 32 *; | [X]DE102009034558 (SEFAR AG [CH]) [X] 1,4-6 * figure 1 * * claims 1-4,15,16 * * paragraph [0009] *; | [X]US2012082827 (BAE AH HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * figures 1,8 * * claims 1,3,5-7 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0034] , [0047] , [0049] *; | [X]KR101283863B (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3-6 * figures 2-3 * * claims 1,10 * |