EP3031120 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST BATTERY CHARGING WITH UNIVERSAL HIGH POWER INPUT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Sai Bun S. 9701 Wolf Creek Drive Irving, TX 76053 / US | 02 /
LI, Qiong M. 2141 Arches Park Court Allen, TX 75013 / US | 03 /
QIAN, Jinrong 1800 Faringdon Drive Plano, TX 75025 / US | 04 /
BRITTON, Jonathan L. 2916 Conner Drive Knoxville, TN 37918 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Zeller, Andreas Texas Instruments Limited Suite 31, Atlas House West Devon Business Park Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 14833912.0 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US49762 | Priority number, date | US201361862298P | 05.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361862298 P | US201461929288P | 20.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461929288 P | US201414338771 | 23.07.2014 Original published format: US201414338771 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021035 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3031120 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, G06F1/26, G06F13/38, H02J7/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
G06F1/263 (EP,US);
G06F1/266 (EP,US);
H02J7/0068 (US);
H02J7/007 (EP,US);
H02J2207/40 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/00034 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | H02J7/02, G06F1/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLEN BATTERIELADEN MIT UNIVERSELLER HOHER LEISTUNGSEINGABEQUELLE | [2016/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST BATTERY CHARGING WITH UNIVERSAL HIGH POWER INPUT SOURCE | [2016/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR CHARGE DE BATTERIE RAPIDE À SOURCE D'ENTRÉE À HAUTE PUISSANCE UNIVERSELLE | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.04.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.04.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.01.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.01.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 08.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010070659 (MA KENNETH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0119]; figures 1-5b *; | [A]US2012119696 (PICARD JEAN [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0045] *; | [A]US2013054983 (ZHOU PEI-QI [CN]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0010] - [0039]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2013082644 (GAGNE NICKOLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - "Battery Charging Specification Revision 1.2", (20101207), URL: http://www.usb.org/developers/devclass_docs, (20130926), XP055081243 [A] 1-15 * pages 6-59 * | International search | [A]US2008265838 (GARG SAURABH [SG], et al); | [A]RU2400904 (SONI EHRIKSSON MOBAJL KOMM JUN [SE]); | [A]US2012096286 (HUANG PAI-CHING [TW], et al) | by applicant | US2008265838 | US2010070659 | RU2400904 | US2012096286 | US2012119696 | US2013054983 | US2013082644 |