EP3030519 - TRICYCLIC BENZOXABOROLE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property (No. 2) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | For all designated states Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2022/09] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Intellectual Property (No. 2) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
For all designated states Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLEY, M.R.K. (Dickon) c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
HERNANDEZ, Vincent S. c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 03 /
PLATTNER, Jacob J. c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 04 /
LI, Xianfeng c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 05 /
BARROS-AGUIRRE, David c/o GlaxoSmithKline Parque Tecnologico de Madrid Calle Doctor Severo Ochoa 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | 06 /
GIORDANO, Ilaria c/o GlaxoSmithKline Parque Tecnologico de Madrid Calle Doctor Severo Ochoa 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | [2021/13] |
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
ALLEY, M.R.K. (Dickon) c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
02 /
HERNANDEZ, Vincent S. c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
03 /
PLATTNER, Jacob J. c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
04 /
LI, Xianfeng c/o Anacor Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1020 East Meadow Circle Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | |||
05 /
BARROS-AGUIRRE, David c/o GlaxoSmithKline Parque Technologico de Madrid Calle Doctor Severo Ochoa 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | |||
06 /
GIORDANO, Ilaria c/o GlaxoSmithKline Parque Technologico de Madrid Calle Doctor Severo Ochoa 28760 Tres Cantos, Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Sardharwala, Fatema Elyasali GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Sardharwala, Fatema Elyasali GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 14834292.6 | 08.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US50370 | Priority number, date | US201361864496P | 09.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361864496 P | US201361918976P | 20.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361918976 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015021396 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3030519 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030519 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/04, A61K31/69, A61P31/06 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,EA,US);
C07F5/04 (EA,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,EA,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F5/025 (EP,EA,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/24] | C01B35/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | 09.03.2016 | ME | 09.03.2016 | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE BENZOXABOROLVERBINDUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2016/24] | English: | TRICYCLIC BENZOXABOROLE COMPOUNDS AND USES THEREOF | [2016/24] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE BENZOXABOROLE TRICYCLIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 19.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21214787.0 / EP4029870 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2016128949 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY (NO 2) LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-20 * paragraphs [0430] - [0443]; example 25 ** page 1; claims 1-53 * | International search | [A]US7816344 (BAKER STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2012115813 (HERNANDEZ VINCENT S [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2013035501 (CONDE JOSE J [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]US2013064783 (BAKER STEPHEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-27* entire document *; | [A]US2013165411 (GORDEEV MIKHAIL FEDOROVICH [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * entire document * | by applicant | US2006234981 | US2007155699 | US2009227541 | WO2010080558 | US7816344 | WO2011127143 | WO2012033858 | US2013165411 | - ZIGNOL, M et al., "M. Surveillance of anti-tuberculosis drug resistance in the world: an updated analysis, 2007-2010", Bull. World Health Organ, (20120000), vol. 90, no. 2, pages 111 - 119 | - WILLIAMS, B. G.DYE, C., Science, (20030000), vol. 301, page 1535 | - CORBETT, E. L et al., Arch. Intl. Med., (20030000), vol. 163, page 1009 | - SEPTKOWITZ, A et al., Clin. Microbiol. Rev., (19950000), vol. 8, page 180 | - "Focus on Tuberculosis", Nature Medicine, (20070000), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 263 - 312 | - GROSSET JHSINGER TGBISHAI WR, "New Drugs for the Treatment of Tuberculosis: Hope and Reality", IntJ Tuberc Lung Dis., (20120800), vol. 16, no. 8, pages 1005 - 14 | - ADAMCZYK-WOZNIAK, A. et al., "Benzoxaboroles - Old compounds with new applications", Journal of Organometallic Chemistry, (20091015), vol. 694, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.jorganchem.2009.07.022, pages 3533 - 3541, XP026587728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jorganchem.2009.07.022 | - BERGE et al., "Pharmaceutical Salts", Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 |