EP2991363 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.07.2019 [2019/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [2019/18] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | ||
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yuanpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YU, Yafang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HOU, Meng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14834561.4 | 06.08.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014CN83788 | Priority number, date | CN201310339216 | 06.08.2013 Original published format: CN201310339216 | [2016/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015018339 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991363 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/24, H04Q1/48, H04M1/02, H01Q1/38, H01Q5/378, H01Q1/52, H01Q1/48 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H04B1/3838 (US);
H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q1/521 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q5/378 (EP,US);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | H04Q1/24, H04Q1/48, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | [2016/09] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS DEVICE | [2016/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2015 | Translation filed | 25.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 01.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.01.2019 | 23.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/27] | 28.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5936583 (SEKINE SYUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 55; figures 14,15a,15b,18; claim 1 * * column 22, lines 40-50; figures 34-38 * * column 8, lines 55-60 *; | [Y]US2007109202 (VANCE SCOTT [SE]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0011] , [0014] , [0025] , [0027]; figures 1,8 *; | [XY]US2011128206 (WAKABAYASHI NAOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] , [0044] - [0046] - [0048] , [0075] , [0076] * [Y] 3; | [Y]US2011291895 (ZAILA SAMUEL [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [0038] - [0043]; figures 1A,4C,6C,8A,8B *; | [A]WO2012151903 (ZTE CORP [CN], et al) [A] 1-4* abstract * | International search | [A]JPS6414113 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE); | [A]JP2000068736 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]CN1582106 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]CN102074786 (RALINK TECHNOLOGY CORP); | [XP]CN103441330 (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) |