EP3030253 - COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING SKIN CONDITIONS COMPRISING A FRAGMENT OF HUMAN HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 90A AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeron, Inc. 103 BIO-2, Chuncheon BioTown 40 Soyanggang-ro Chuncheon-si, Gangwon-do 200-957 / KR | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Kibum 103 BIO-2 Chuncheon BioTown 40 Soyanggang-ro Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-957 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Kyunyoung 103 BIO-2 Chuncheon BioTown 40 Soyanggang-ro Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-957 / KR | 03 /
CHO, Youngwook 202-1203 Joongang Heightsville-the 2nd 2141-25 Youngseo-ro Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-783 / KR | 04 /
OH, Dahlkyun 103 BIO-2 Chuncheon BioTown 40 Soyanggang-ro Chuncheon-si Gangwon-do 200-957 / KR | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14834605.9 | 11.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014KR07430 | Priority number, date | KR20130094930 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130094930 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015020499 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030253 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030253 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K9/127, A61K38/17, A61P17/00, A61K8/64, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/06, A61Q19/08, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/32, A61K8/14, A61P17/02 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61K8/14 (EP,US);
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/127 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
A61Q19/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/06 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/15] | A61K38/16, A61K9/127, A61K38/17, A61P17/00, A61K8/64, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/06, A61Q19/08, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/32, A61K8/14 | ||
Former IPC [2016/24] | A61K38/16, A61K9/127, A61K38/17, A61P17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES HAUTZUSTANDES MIT EINEM FRAGMENT DES HUMANEM HITZESCHOCKPROTEINS 90A ALS WIRKSTOFF | [2016/24] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING SKIN CONDITIONS COMPRISING A FRAGMENT OF HUMAN HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 90A AS AN ACTIVE INGREDIENT | [2016/24] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR AMÉLIORER DES ÉTATS CUTANÉS COMPORTANT UN FRAGMENT DE LA PROTÉINE DE CHOC THERMIQUE 90A HUMAINE EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2019 | 31.08.2020 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2021 | 31.08.2023 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN1331171 (BODE GENE DEV CO LTD SHANGHAI [CN]) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * page 9, line 42 - page 11, line 27 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]US2007081963 (OH DAHL K [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-16 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0062] *; | [Y] - LI WEI ET AL, "Secreted heat shock protein-90 (Hsp90) in wound healing and cancer", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR CELL RESEARCH, (20110925), vol. 1823, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBAMCR.2011.09.009, ISSN 0167-4889, pages 730 - 741, XP028896527 [Y] 1-15 * page 731, column l, line 3 - page 736, column r, line 16 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamcr.2011.09.009 | International search | [A]US2007081963 (OH DAHL K [KR], et al); | [A]WO2011019668 (MELTOLOGY LLC [US], et al); | [A]US8303984 (DOROGI PETER LADISLAUS [US], et al); | [A] - "HEAT SHOCK PROTEIN 90KDA ALPHA (CYTOSOLIC), CLASS A MEMBER 1, ISOFORM CRA_B [HOMO SAPIENS]", GENBANK, (20061218), Database accession no. EAW81767, XP055318404 | [A] - LI ET AL., "Secreted heat shock protein-90 (Hsp90) in wound healing and cancer", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2012), vol. 1823, no. 3, pages 730 - 741, XP028896527 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbamcr.2011.09.009 | [A] - WOLF ET AL., "Topical treatment with liposomes containing T4 endonuclease V protects human skin in vivo from ultraviolet-induced upregulation of interleukin-10 and tumor necrosis factor-a", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (2000), vol. 114, no. 1, pages 149 - 156, XP055318416 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.00839.x | Examination | US2011082082 | by applicant | US2007081963 | US2011082082 |