EP3086877 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Tsubasa c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
KONO, Jun c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
ATAKA, Yoshiharu c/o Kao Corporation research and Development 2-1-3, Bunka Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 14835531.6 | 26.12.2014 | [2016/44] | WO2014JP06498 | Priority number, date | JP20130268427 | 26.12.2013 Original published format: JP 2013268427 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015098121 | Date: | 02.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3086877 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3086877 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/04, B01J23/78, B01J35/00, C07C45/00 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
C07C45/002 (EP,US);
C07C45/29 (CN);
B01J23/745 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/78 (CN);
B01J23/8892 (CN,US);
B01J27/232 (CN);
B01J31/0275 (US);
B01J31/04 (CN);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J37/035 (EP,US);
B01J2231/76 (CN);
B01J2231/763 (US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/002, C07C47/02 (EP,US);
C07C45/29, C07C47/02 (CN);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/31, B01J2523/842 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALDEHYD | [2016/44] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ALDEHYDE | [2016/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ALDÉHYDE | [2016/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 25.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.12.2014 | AL | 05.06.2019 | AT | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | IT | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | NL | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SE | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | IE | 26.12.2019 | LU | 26.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | FR | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/35] | HU | 26.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
FR | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.12.2014 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
IT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
AT | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
NL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
SE | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 05.06.2019 | |
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB739263 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [AD]JPH05168928 (KAO CORP) [AD] 1-11* abstract *; | [ID]JP2010099635 (DAICEL CHEM) [ID] 1-11 * the whole document * |