EP3034076 - COMBINED APPLICATION OF ISOTHIOCYANATE COMPOUND AND ANTI-CANCER MEDICINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JC (Wuxi) COMPANY, Inc. No. 200, 5th District, Science and Technology Park 7 Changjiang Road New District Wuxi 214028, JS / CN | [2016/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Jingcai No.200 Floor 2 5th District Building A Science and Technology Park, 7 Changjiang Road, Wuxi New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Chunxia No.200 Floor 2 5th District Building A Science and Technology Park, 7 Changjiang Road, Wuxi New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | 03 /
CHENG, Zhiwei No.200 Floor 2 5th District Building A Science and Technology Park, 7 Changjiang Road, Wuxi New District Wuxi Jiangsu 214028 / CN | [2016/25] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2016/25] | Application number, filing date | 14836229.6 | 13.08.2014 | [2016/25] | WO2014CN84324 | Priority number, date | CN201310352414 | 13.08.2013 Original published format: CN201310352414 | CN201310364101 | 20.08.2013 Original published format: CN201310364101 | CN201410346419 | 18.07.2014 Original published format: CN201410346419 | [2016/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021929 | Date: | 19.02.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3034076 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3034076 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/26, A61P35/00, A61K45/06 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/26 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/17 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/33 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/4412 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K33/36 (EP,US);
A61K38/10 (EP,US);
A61K38/14 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/26, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/436, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/475, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/506, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/58, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2016/25] | A61K31/26, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE ANWENDUNG EINER ISOTHIOCYANATVERBINDUNG UND EINER KREBSBEKÄMPFENDEN MEDIZIN | [2016/25] | English: | COMBINED APPLICATION OF ISOTHIOCYANATE COMPOUND AND ANTI-CANCER MEDICINE | [2016/25] | French: | UTILISATION COMBINÉE D'UN MÉDICAMENT ANTI-CANCÉREUX ET D'UN COMPOSÉ DE LA CLASSE DES ISOTHIOCYANATES | [2016/25] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2016 | Translation filed | 11.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 07.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2014 | AL | 30.09.2020 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MK | 30.09.2020 | NL | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | RS | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | SM | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MK | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/37] | HU | 13.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 13.08.2014 | |
AL | 30.09.2020 | ||
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 30.09.2020 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SM | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RS | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1564305 (INST CURIE [FR], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 4; claims 9-10 *; | [X]US2008124407 (EATON DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0062]; claim 11 *; | [A]US2009005438 (CHENG JINGCAI [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 42] *; | [X]WO2009108755 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 4; claim 3 *; | [X]WO2009108857 (COMBITHERA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * claim 39 *; | [X]WO2010065329 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0019] - [0020] - [0088] *; | [X]US2013079401 (CHEN YU-JEN [TW], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0039]; claim - *; | [X] - WANG X ET AL, "ENHANCED CYTOTOXICITY OF MITOMYCIN C IN HUMAN TUMOUR CELLS WITH INDUCERS OF DT-DIAPHORASE", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (19900601), vol. 80, no. 8, doi:10.1038/SJ.BJC.6690489, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 1223 - 1230, XP008017449 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6690489 | [X] - Elaine Tseng ET AL, "Effect of Organic Isothiocyanates on the P-Glycoprotein- and MRP1-Mediated Transport of Daunomycin and Vinblastine", Pharmaceutical Research, New York, doi:10.1023/A:1020460700877, (20021001), pages 1509 - 1515, URL: http://rd.springer.com/article/10.1023%2FA%3A1020460700877, XP055288446 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1020460700877 | [X] - YAN JI ET AL, "Effect of Organic Isothiocyanates on Breast Cancer Resistance Protein (ABCG2)-Mediated Transport", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, (20041201), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S11095-004-7679-1, ISSN 1573-904X, pages 2261 - 2269, XP019370667 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-004-7679-1 | [X] - SUTAPA MUKHERJEE ET AL, "Isothiocyanates sensitize the effect of chemotherapeutic drugs via modulation of protein kinase C and telomerase in cervical cancer cells", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20090412), vol. 330, no. 1-2, doi:10.1007/S11010-009-0095-4, ISSN 1573-4919, pages 9 - 22, XP019772739 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11010-009-0095-4 | [X] - D. TRACHOOTHAM ET AL, "Effective elimination of fludarabine-resistant CLL cells by PEITC through a redox-mediated mechanism", BLOOD, US, (20080901), vol. 112, no. 5, doi:10.1182/blood-2008-04-149815, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1912 - 1922, XP055288453 [X] 1-14 * page 1918 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-04-149815 | [X] - GEORGIOS KALLIFATIDIS ET AL, "Sulforaphane Increases Drug-mediated Cytotoxicity Toward Cancer Stem-like Cells of Pancreas and Prostate", MOLECULAR THERAPY, GB, (20101012), vol. 19, no. 1, doi:10.1038/mt.2010.216, ISSN 1525-0016, pages 188 - 195, XP055288280 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/mt.2010.216 | [X] - BETTINA M. KAMINSKI ET AL, "Sulforaphane potentiates oxaliplatin-induced cell growth inhibition in colorectal cancer cells via induction of different modes of cell death", CANCER CHEMOTHERAPY AND PHARMACOLOGY., BERLIN., (20100806), vol. 67, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s00280-010-1413-y, ISSN 0344-5704, pages 1167 - 1178, XP055288458 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00280-010-1413-y | [X] - XIANTAO WANG ET AL, "Phenethyl isothiocyanate sensitizes human cervical cancer cells to apoptosis induced by cisplatin", MOLECULAR NUTRITION & FOOD RESEARCH, (20110519), vol. 55, no. 10, doi:10.1002/mnfr.201000560, ISSN 1613-4125, pages 1572 - 1581, XP055161158 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mnfr.201000560 | [X] - KATHERINE LIU ET AL, "Synergistic effect of paclitaxel and epigenetic agent phenethyl isothiocyanate on growth inhibition, cell cycle arrest and apoptosis in breast cancer cells", CANCER CELL INTERNATIONAL, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20130207), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1475-2867-13-10, ISSN 1475-2867, page 10, XP021145453 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1475-2867-13-10 | [X] - AAMER QAZI ET AL, "Anticancer Activity of a Broccoli Derivative, Sulforaphane, in Barrett Adenocarcinoma: Potential Use in Chemoprevention and as Adjuvant in Chemotherapy", TRANSLATIONAL ONCOLOGY, United States, (20101201), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:10.1593/tlo.10235, ISSN 1936-5233, pages 389 - 399, XP055288539 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1593/tlo.10235 | [X] - Suppipat, "Targeting AKT Signaling in Pediatric Acute Lymphoblastic Leukemia with Sulforaphane | Blood Journal", Blood 2011 118:1521, (20110101), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/118/21/1521, (20160714), XP055288536 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - DONG XIAO ET AL, "Phenethyl Isothiocyanate Sensitizes Androgen-Independent Human Prostate Cancer Cells to Docetaxel-Induced Apoptosis In Vitro and In Vivo", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NL, (20100225), vol. 27, no. 4, doi:10.1007/S11095-010-0079-9, ISSN 1573-904X, pages 722 - 731, XP019793962 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-010-0079-9 | [XP] - ANNA MINARINI ET AL, "Exploring the effects of isothiocyanates on chemotherapeutic drugs", EXPERT OPINION ON DRUG METABOLISM & TOXICOLOGY, GB, (20131003), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1517/17425255.2013.843668, ISSN 1742-5255, pages 25 - 38, XP055288278 [XP] 1-14 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/17425255.2013.843668 | [A] - V. RAUSCH ET AL, "Synergistic Activity of Sorafenib and Sulforaphane Abolishes Pancreatic Cancer Stem Cell Characteristics", CANCER RESEARCH, (20100608), vol. 70, no. 12, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-0066, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5004 - 5013, XP055022831 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-0066 | [X] - LI-CHING LIN ET AL, "Sulforaphane Potentiates the Efficacy of Imatinib against Chronic Leukemia Cancer Stem Cells through Enhanced Abrogation of Wnt/[beta]-Catenin Function", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, US, (20120718), vol. 60, no. 28, doi:10.1021/jf301981n, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 7031 - 7039, XP055300713 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf301981n | [X] - DOUDICAN N A ET AL, "Enhancement of arsenic trioxide cytotoxicity by dietary isothiocyanates in human leukemic cells via a reactive oxygen species-dependent mechanism", LEUKEMIA RESEARCH, NEW YORK,NY, US, vol. 34, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.LEUKRES.2009.05.017, ISSN 0145-2126, (20100201), pages 229 - 234, (20090621), XP026915688 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.leukres.2009.05.017 | [X] - Y. HU ET AL, "Overcoming resistance to histone deacetylase inhibitors in human leukemia with the redox modulating compound -phenylethyl isothiocyanate", BLOOD, US, (20101014), vol. 116, no. 15, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-11-256354, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2732 - 2741, XP055288476 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-11-256354 | [X] - Marianna Halasi ET AL, "TUMORIGENESIS AND NEOPLASTIC PROGRESSION Combination of Oxidative Stress and FOXM1 Inhibitors Induces Apoptosis in Cancer Cells and Inhibits Xenograft Tumor Growth From the Departments of Medicine* and Biochemistry and Molecular Genetics", Am J Pathol, (20130101), pages 257 - 265, URL: http://ac.els-cdn.com/S0002944013002691/1-s2.0-S0002944013002691-main.pdf?_tid=cd7e5c10-74f4-11e6-9f77-00000aab0f26&acdnat=1473250725_1e1440be1abd78ef90649ed94a8647a4, XP055300636 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - HERR, "Dietary polyphenol quercetin targets pancreatic cancer stem cells", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY, GR, (20100721), vol. 37, no. 3, doi:10.3892/ijo_00000704, ISSN 1019-6439, XP055300640 [X] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3892/ijo_00000704 | [X] - Jakubikova, "Sulforaphane and PEITC Augment Activity of Conventional and Novel Anti-Myeloma Drugs", Blood, 112(11) 916, (20081116), URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/content/112/11/2648, (20160908), XP055300830 [X] 1-14 * abstract * | [X] - DANIEL K CHAN ET AL, "Metformin and phenethyl isothiocyanate combined treatment in vitro is cytotoxic to ovarian cancer cultures", JOURNAL OF OVARIAN RESEARCH, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20120710), vol. 5, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1757-2215-5-19, ISSN 1757-2215, page 19, XP021117288 [X] 1-4,6-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1757-2215-5-19 | International search | [X]CN101167741 (BEIJING TUBERCULOSIS AND THORA [CN]); | [X] - DONG, XIAO ET AL., "Phenethyl Isothiocyanate Sensitizes Androgen-Independent Human Prostate Cancer Cells to Docetaxel-Induced Apoptosis In Vitro and In Vivo", PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (20101231), vol. 4, no. 27, pages 722 - 731, XP019793962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11095-010-0079-9 | [X] - VANESSA RAUSCH ET AL., "Synergistic Activity of Sorafenib and Sulforaphane Abolishes Pancreatic Cancer Stem Cell Characteristics", CANCER RESEARCH, (20101231), vol. 12, no. 70, pages 5004 - 5013, XP055022831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-10-0066 | Examination | - Arif Hussain ET AL, "Concurrent Sulforaphane and Eugenol Induces Differential Effects on Human Cervical Cancer Cells", INTEGRATIVE CANCER THERAPIES, US, (20110307), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1177/1534735411400313, ISSN 1534-7354, pages 154 - 165, XP055461799 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1534735411400313 | - LIDIA SLIWKA ET AL, "The Comparison of MTT and CVS Assays for the Assessment of Anticancer Agent Interactions", PLOS ONE, (20160519), vol. 11, no. 5, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0155772, page e0155772, XP055461801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0155772 | - Gerlinde Pappa ET AL, "Quantitative combination effects between sulforaphane and 3,3'-diindolylmethane on proliferation of human colon cancer cells in vitro", CARCINOGENESIS., GB, (20070701), vol. 28, no. 7, doi:10.1093/carcin/bgm044, ISSN 0143-3334, pages 1471 - 1477, XP055461802 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/carcin/bgm044 | by applicant | CA2630262 | US8039511 | US8410170 | JP5308160B | CN20051040865 | EP20060817815 | CN20091052231 |