EP3037930 - CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dexerials Corporation Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F 1-11-2, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODAGIRI, Hirokazu c/o DEXERIALS CORPORATION Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F 1-11-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 02 /
MURAKAMI, Yukio c/o DEXERIALS CORPORATION Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F 1-11-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Yoshiaki c/o DEXERIALS CORPORATION Gate City Osaki East Tower 8F 1-11-2 Osaki, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14838193.2 | 06.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014JP70709 | Priority number, date | JP20130170311 | 20.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013170311 | [2016/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015025711 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3037930 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F2203/04103 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER BERÜHRUNGSBILDSCHIRM | [2016/26] | English: | CAPACITIVE TOUCH PANEL | [2016/26] | French: | ÉCRAN TACTILE CAPACITIF | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2016 | Translation filed | 18.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 31.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 07.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2333649 (J TOUCH CORP [TW]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0037] *; | [Y]WO2005109449 (HS PLANNING LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0072] *; | [A] - CHRISTOPHER SEUBERT ET AL, "An Overview of the Scratch Resistance of Automotive Coatings: Exterior Clearcoats and Polycarbonate Hardcoats", COATINGS, (20121112), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.3390/coatings2040221, pages 221 - 234, XP055357851 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/coatings2040221 | International search | [A]JP2002222055 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2011039978 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2013161203 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2012018590 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]JP2010165460 (NISSHA PRINTING) | by applicant | JP2000207983 |