EP3039421 - SERUM ANTIBODY ASSAY FOR DETERMINING PROTECTION FROM MALARIA, AND PRE-ERYTHROCYTIC SUBUNIT VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanaria Inc. 9800 Medical Center Drive - A209 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | For all designated states Antigen Discovery Inc. 1 Technology Drive E309 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | For all designated states The United States of America, represented by the Secretary, Department of Health and Human Services Office of Technology Transfer National Institutes of Health 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, Maryland 20892-7660 / US | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELGNER, Philip c/o Antigen Discovery Inc. 1 Technology Dr. E309 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 02 /
HOFFMAN, Stephen L. c/o Sanaria Inc. 9800 Medical Center Dr. A209 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
SEDER, Robert c/o National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325, MSC 7660 Bethesda, Maryland 20892-7660 / US | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14839238.4 | 02.09.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014US53745 | Priority number, date | US201361872527P | 30.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361872527 P | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015031904 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3039421 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/015, G01N33/68 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/6854 (EP,US);
A61K39/015 (EP,US);
G01N2333/445 (EP,US);
G01N2469/20 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | G01N33/00, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | SERUM-ANTIKÖRPER-ASSAY ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES SCHUTZES GEGEN MALARIA UND PRÄ-ERYTHROZYTÄRE SUBUNIT-IMPFSTOFF | [2016/27] | English: | SERUM ANTIBODY ASSAY FOR DETERMINING PROTECTION FROM MALARIA, AND PRE-ERYTHROCYTIC SUBUNIT VACCINES | [2016/27] | French: | DOSAGE D'ANTICORPS SÉRIQUES PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA PROTECTION CONTRE LE PALUDISME ET VACCINS SOUS-UNITAIRES DIRIGÉS CONTRE LES STADES PRÉ-ÉRYTHROCYTAIRES | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - ANDREW M. REDMOND ET AL, "The Australasian Contribution to Malaria Vaccine Development", PARASITE IMMUNOLOGY., GB, (20100401), doi:10.1111/j.1365-3024.2010.01229.x, ISSN 0141-9838, pages no - no, XP055350162 [Y] 1,3-14 * abstract * * page 610, column 2, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 613, column 2, paragraph 3 * [A] 2,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-3024.2010.01229.x | [YA] - UDAYVENKAT MATETI ET AL, "Advanced malarial vaccines: A promising approach in the treatment of malaria", SYSTEMATIC REVIEWS IN PHARMACY, IND, (20120101), vol. 3, no. 1, doi:10.4103/0975-8453.107136, ISSN 0975-8453, page 31, XP055350166 [Y] 1,3-14 * abstract * * page 32, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 32, column 2, paragraph 2 * * table 1 * [A] 2,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4103/0975-8453.107136 | International search | [X]US2008260763 (FELGNER PHILIP [US], et al); | [A]WO2006061965 (UNIV OSAKA [JP], et al) |