EP3039865 - THEATER PARAMETER MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ CGV Co., Ltd. 10th 434 World cup buk-ro Mapo-gu Seoul 121-835 / KR | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hwan Chul 101-1005 Yuwon Apt. Seocho-dong 43 Seochojungang-ro 24-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 137-070 / KR | 02 /
KANG, Su Ryeon 506-601 Munchon Maeul 5 Danji Apt. Juyeop 2-dong 161 Daesan-ro Ilsanseo-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 411-372 / KR | 03 /
KANG, Jihyung 102-1107 Geunhyeong Symphony Apt. 1155 Baran-ro Jeongnam-myeon Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-964 / KR | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Caspary, Karsten, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14839402.6 | 14.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014KR07575 | Priority number, date | KR20130101353 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: KR 20130101353 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015030399 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039865 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31, A63J25/00 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
G03B35/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
A63J25/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03B21/005 (EP,US);
G03B37/04 (EP,CN,US);
H04N21/41415 (US);
H04N5/74 (KR);
H04N9/3147 (EP,CN,US);
H04N9/3185 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/17] | H04N13/00, H04N5/74, A63J25/00, H04N9/31 | ||
Former IPC [2016/27] | H04N13/00, H04N5/74, A63J25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON THEATERPARAMETERN | [2016/27] | English: | THEATER PARAMETER MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE PARAMÈTRES DE CINÉMA | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 23.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5963247 (BANITT SHMUEL [IL]) [Y] 2-4,9,11,12 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 14 - line 19 * * column 10, line 8 - line 21 * * column 7, line 38 - line 40 *; | [Y]US2008013057 (BULLOCK ROGER LEE [US]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A]US2002024640 (IOKA KEN [JP]) [A] 1,11,12,15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0059] * | [XY] - Bluegreen, "CinemaTheatre", (20070205), URL: https://www.turbosquid.com/3d-models/3d-model-movie-theatre/339567, (20170309), XP055353105 [X] 1,5-8,10,15 * Description * * 3D Model Specifications * * page 4 - page 6 * * page 1 * [Y] 2-4,9,11,12 | [XYI] - D3, "d3", (20130717), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130817151731/http://www.d3technologies.com/what_is_d3, (20170815), XP055398745 [X] 1-7,10,15 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 6 * * page 10 - page 11 * * page 15 * [Y] 11-14 [I] 8,9 | [X] - Carlton Bale, "Home Theater Calculator: Viewing Distance, Screen Size", (20130805), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20130805220837/http://carltonbale.com/home-theater/home-theater-calculator/, (20170308), XP055352847 [X] 1,5,15 * theater_calculator_v4.1.xlsx * | [Y] - ENRIQUE VALERO ET AL, "Automatic Construction of 3D Basic-Semantic Models of Inhabited Interiors Using Laser Scanners and RFID Sensors", SENSORS, (20120503), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.3390/s120505705, pages 5705 - 5724, XP055398754 [Y] 13,14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/s120505705 | [Y] - MARC POLLEFEYS ET AL, "From Images to 3D Models How computers can automatically build realistic 3D models from images acquired with a hand-held camera", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, (20020101), vol. 45, pages 50 - 55, XP055398759 [Y] 13,14 * page 3 * | International search | [Y]EP0751689 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO02078396 (HARMAN INT IND [US], et al); | [A]US2013173327 (LANCE ANGEL [US], et al); | [A]US2011310354 (FUJIMORI TOSHIKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006212145 (SINGH RAJIV [US], et al) |