EP3041041 - ELECTRONIC APPARATUS COMPRISING A HOUSING PACKAGE FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/27] | PACKAGE FOR ACCOMMODATING ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | ||
[2018/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIINO, Noritaka c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2016/27] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14839509.8 | 22.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014JP72034 | Priority number, date | JP20130178177 | 29.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013178177 | [2016/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015029907 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041041 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3041041 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/057, H01L21/50, H01L23/00, H01L23/02, H01L23/08, H01L23/10, H01L23/13, H01L23/15, H01L23/498 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H01L23/057 (EP,US);
H05K5/0095 (US);
H01L21/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/10 (EP,US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/49827 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H05K5/0213 (US);
H05K5/066 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L24/92 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP);
H01L2924/15156 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15159 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15313 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16195 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16747 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1676 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/83 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/85 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2016/44] | H01L23/057, H01L21/50, H01L23/02, H01L23/08, H01L23/10 | ||
Former IPC [2016/27] | H01L23/08, H01L23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT UMFASSEND EIN GEHÄUSE ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTS | [2018/14] | English: | ELECTRONIC APPARATUS COMPRISING A HOUSING PACKAGE FOR ACCOMMODATING AN ELECTRONIC COMPONENT | [2018/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN BOÎTIER DESTINÉ À ACCUEILLIR UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE. | [2018/14] |
Former [2016/27] | GEHÄUSE ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN BAUELEMENTS UND ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/27] | PACKAGE FOR ACCOMMODATING ELECTRONIC COMPONENT, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/27] | EMBALLAGE DESTINÉ À ACCUEILLIR UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | Translation filed | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 14.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2014 | AL | 29.08.2018 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | HR | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | MK | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | RS | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | SM | 29.08.2018 | TR | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | NO | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 22.08.2014 | |
AL | 29.08.2018 | ||
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
TR | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
SM | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
HR | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RS | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NO | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5111277 (MEDEIROS III MANUEL [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [YD]JP2001308212 (KYOCERA CORP) [YD] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2003258139 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]US2006049396 (PICHLER KARL [AT], et al) [Y] 1-6,8 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JP2013042003 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH06506321 (OLIN CORP.); | [Y]JPH07336046 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]JP2005158964 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2013042003 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) | Examination | US2012217660 | by applicant | JP2001308212 |