EP3027051 - OXYGEN UPTAKE COMPOSITIONS AND PRESERVATION OF OXYGEN PERISHABLE GOODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JP Patents L.L.C. 8849 Sackett Drive Park City UT 84098 / US | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FULLER, Peter E. 3277 West 7545 South West Jordan, UT 84084 / US | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14839933.0 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014US53532 | Priority number, date | US201361872783P | 02.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361872783 P | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015031827 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027051 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A23L3/3436, B01J20/04 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
B01J20/22 (EP,US);
A01N1/021 (EP,US);
A01N3/00 (EP,US);
A01N59/04 (EP,US);
A23B4/16 (EP,US);
A23B7/148 (EP,US);
A23L3/3436 (EP,US);
A23L3/3508 (EP,US);
A23L3/358 (EP,US);
B01J20/043 (EP,US);
B01J20/28016 (EP,US);
B01J20/2805 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/04, A01N37/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | SAUERSTOFFAUFNAHMEZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND KONSERVIERUNG VON SAUERSTOFFVERDERBLICHEN WAREN | [2016/23] | English: | OXYGEN UPTAKE COMPOSITIONS AND PRESERVATION OF OXYGEN PERISHABLE GOODS | [2016/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ABSORPTION D'OXYGÈNE ET CONSERVATION DE MARCHANDISES PÉRISSABLES SENSIBLES À L'OXYGÈNE | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 10.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/03] | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2018 | 31.08.2019 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5236617 (UENO RYUZO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, lines 8-20 * * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 28 ** example -; claim - *; | [I]US2004242746 (FREEDMAN JON [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] - [0006] - [0010] , [0014] - [0027] * * claim - *; | [I]US7387205 (WILSON CHARLES I [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 1, lines 6-27 * * column 2, line 38 - column 5, line 43 * * example -; claim - *; | [I]US2010047405 (VERSTEYLEN SAYANDRO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0012] - [0088] *; | [XI]US2012301409 (JENSEN NED L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-14 * paragraphs [0072] - [0075] * * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] - [0021] * [I] 6,15 | International search | [Y]US6274304 (BUSCHEK HERBERT [DE], et al); | [A]US6447826 (MATTHEWS ANDREW ERNEST [AU]); | [Y]US2004247750 (FINNEGAN MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y]US2007041885 (MAZIUK JOHN JR [US]); | [A]WO2012156685 (EMCO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al) |