EP3043343 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASUDA, Ryouhei c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
NODA, Takuro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 14840503.8 | 18.06.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014JP66201 | Priority number, date | JP20130181227 | 02.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013181227 | [2016/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015029554 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3043343 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00, G09G5/22, G09G5/26, G09G5/36, G09G5/38, G06F3/0346, G06F3/048, H04N5/445, G06F3/01, G06F3/0482, G06K9/00 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06V40/165 (US);
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
G09G5/26 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (US);
H04N5/44504 (US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | G09G5/00, G09G5/22, G09G5/26, G09G5/36, G09G5/38, G06F3/0346, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2016/28] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2016/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2016 | Translation filed | 29.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 29.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.04.2019 | 04.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/37] | 03.05.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007279591 (WEZOWSKI MARTIN MARCIN ROBERT [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] - [0 47] - [0048] - [0 53] - [0074]; figures 1, 2, 3, 4A, 4B, 5B, 7 * [I] 5,6,8-10; | [XI]US2011001763 (MURAKAMI TOMOYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,12 * paragraphs [0054] - [0063] - [0 71] - [0076]; figures 2, 3A, 3B, 6, 7, 8, 9 * [I] 4-6,10; | [A]US2013002551 (IMOTO HIROYASU [JP], et al) [A] 2 * paragraph [0012]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2011115883 (KELLERMAN MARCUS [US], et al) [A] 3,8 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2009164896 (THORN KARL OLA [SE]) [A] 4-6 * paragraphs [0053] - [0056]; figures 4, 5 * | International search | [X]WO2010089989 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2008096776 (KONAMI DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT); | [Y]JP2000138872 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2002062863 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2009031368 (NEC CORP); | [A]WO2011158511 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011510364 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AB.); | [A]JP2013120347 (SAMSUNG YOKOHAMA RES INST CO); | [AP]WO2014084193 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) | by applicant | WO2009125481 | JP2008096776 |