EP3041045 - BONDED BODY AND POWER MODULE SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/27] | ASSEMBLY AND POWER-MODULE SUBSTRATE | ||
[2019/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2019/31] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | ||
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Materials Corporation 3-2, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8117 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERASAKI Nobuyuki c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1975-2, Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi, Saitama 364-0022 / JP | 02 /
NAGATOMO Yoshiyuki c/o MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION Central Research Institute 1975-2, Shimoishitokami Kitamoto-shi, Saitama 364-0022 / JP | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14841139.0 | 18.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014JP71524 | Priority number, date | JP20130175002 | 26.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013175002 | [2016/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015029811 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041045 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3041045 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/13, B23K35/30, C04B37/02, C22C9/02, H01L23/12, H01L23/40, B23K35/32, B23K35/02, H01L23/473, C22C14/00, H05K1/03, C22C9/00, H01L23/15, H01L23/373, H01L21/48 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
B23K35/30 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/0222 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/09 (US);
B23K35/0233 (EP,US);
B23K35/0244 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/025 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/302 (EP,US);
B23K35/3026 (EP,KR,US);
B23K35/325 (EP,US);
C04B37/02 (KR,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C22C9/00 (EP,US);
C22C9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/4882 (EP,KR,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
H01L23/3735 (EP,KR,US);
H05K1/0306 (US);
B23K2101/36 (KR);
C04B2237/121 (EP,US);
C04B2237/122 (EP,US);
C04B2237/123 (EP,US);
C04B2237/124 (EP,US);
C04B2237/366 (EP,US);
C04B2237/368 (EP,US);
C04B2237/402 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/58 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L23/473 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/13] | H01L23/13, B23K35/30, C04B37/02, C22C9/02, H01L23/12, H01L23/40, B23K35/32, B23K35/02, H01L23/473, C22C14/00, H05K1/03, C22C9/00, H01L23/15, H01L23/373, H01L21/48, H05K1/09 | ||
Former IPC [2016/27] | H01L23/13, B23K35/30, C04B37/02, C22C9/02, H01L23/12, H01L23/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBUNDKÖRPER UND LEISTUNGSMODULSUBSTRAT | [2019/17] | English: | BONDED BODY AND POWER MODULE SUBSTRATE | [2019/17] | French: | CORPS COLLÉ ET SUBSTRAT DE MODULE DE PUISSANCE | [2019/17] |
Former [2016/27] | ANORDNUNG UND STROMMODULSUBSTRAT | ||
Former [2016/27] | ASSEMBLY AND POWER-MODULE SUBSTRATE | ||
Former [2016/27] | ASSEMBLAGE ET SUBSTRAT DE MODULE D'ALIMENTATION | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2016 | Translation filed | 19.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 19.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2014 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | IT | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
IT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4460658 (BOSE DEBASIS [US], et al) [A] 1-5* column 1, lines 1-10; claim 1; table 1 *; | [A]US5378294 (RISSANEN PETRI T [FI]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 12 - line 31 * * column 2, line 49 - line 64; table 1 *; | [A]JPH0970686 (HITACHI CABLE) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001085571 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 1; claim 1; table 1 * * abstract *; | [A]US6232657 (KOMORITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 13, line 14 - column 14, line 24; claims 1,6,7,12,24 *; | [A]US6261703 (SASAKI KAZUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 23 * * column 25, line 57 - column 26, line 20; claims 1,7; table 1 *; | [A]WO2004018147 (J W HARRIS CO INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 4, lines 16-23; table 1 * * page 12, lines 16-21; figure 1; claims 1-13 *; | [A]US2009283309 (NABA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] , [0020] , [0037] , [0038] , [0042] , [0050] - [0053]; figure 1; claims 1-14; table 1 *; | [A]WO2013024813 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0088] , [0089] , [0135] - [0137]; claims 7,13 * | International search | [A]JPH04295065 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [A]JPH10102167 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV, et al); | [A]JPH10286666 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2001085571 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO); | [A]JP2008221290 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2013098387 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) | Examination | EP2978018 | EP2978019 | by applicant | JP4375730B |