EP3041503 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR VIRAL VECTORED VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altimmune Inc. 19 Firstfield Road, Ste 200 Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2016/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, De-chu 1163 Riverchase Parkway West Birmingham, AL 35244 / US | [2016/28] | Representative(s) | Bates, Rosica Florence Brunswick IP Limited 6 Brunswick Cottages Midsummer Common Cambridge CB5 8DL / GB | [2016/28] | Application number, filing date | 14841665.4 | 05.09.2014 | [2016/28] | WO2014US54234 | Priority number, date | US201361874505P | 06.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361874505 P | [2016/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015035128 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3041503 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, A61K39/23, A61K45/00, A61K39/00 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/235 (KR);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/28] | A61K39/12, A61K39/23, A61K45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR VIRALE VEKTORISIERTE IMPFSTOFFE | [2016/28] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR VIRAL VECTORED VACCINES | [2016/28] | French: | MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR VACCINS VIRAUX VECTORISÉS | [2016/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2012129295 (VAXIN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,13,14 * claims 1-15 * [Y] 5,6,15 [I] 12; | [XYI] - C. D. SCALLAN ET AL, "An Adenovirus-Based Vaccine with a Double-Stranded RNA Adjuvant Protects Mice and Ferrets against H5N1 Avian Influenza in Oral Delivery Models", CLINICAL AND VACCINE IMMUNOLOGY, US, (20121114), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1128/CVI.00552-12, ISSN 1556-6811, pages 85 - 94, XP055361762 [X] 1-4,7-11,13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,15 [I] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00552-12 | [Y] - Hideki Hasegawa ET AL, "Development of mucosal adjuvants for intranasal vaccine for H5N1 infl uenza viruses", Therapeutics and Clinical Risk Management, (20090101), pages 5 - 125, URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/3b65/a4aa5c6b9c0e67500d4d92d3e1d6e892c916.pdf, XP055361759 [Y] 5,6,15 * page 127, column lhc, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - D. R. BRAUCHER ET AL, "Intranasal Vaccination with Replication-Defective Adenovirus Type 5 Encoding Influenza Virus Hemagglutinin Elicits Protective Immunity to Homologous Challenge and Partial Protection to Heterologous Challenge in Pigs", CLINICAL AND VACCINE IMMUNOLOGY, (20121101), vol. 19, no. 11, doi:10.1128/CVI.00315-12, ISSN 1556-6811, pages 1722 - 1729, XP055132141 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00315-12 | [Y] - KUMAKI Y ET AL, "Single-dose intranasal administration with mDEF201 (adenovirus vectored mouse interferon-alpha) confers protection from mortality in a lethal SARS-CoV BALB/c mouse model", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 89, no. 1, ISSN 0166-3542, (20110101), pages 75 - 82, (20110101), XP027586729 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - M. CASKEY ET AL, "Synthetic double-stranded RNA induces innate immune responses similar to a live viral vaccine in humans", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20111107), vol. 181, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0009753, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 276 - 2366, XP055110391 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20111171 | [A] - PETERS WENDY ET AL, "Oral administration of an adenovirus vector encoding both an avian influenza A hemagglutinin and a TLR3 ligand induces antigen specific granzyme B and IFN-[gamma] T cell responses in humans", VACCINE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130125), vol. 31, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2013.01.023, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 1752 - 1758, XP028998365 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2013.01.023 | International search | [X]US2006223742 (SALAZAR ANDRES M [US]); | [X]US2011081375 (TUCKER SEAN N [US]) |