Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9350176 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2016020622 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08272 | 03.09.2014 | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6124272B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B2 | JP2016532400 | 13.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08272 | 03.09.2014 | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105122581B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2018 | B | CN105122581 | 02.12.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08272 | 03.09.2014 | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2963767 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2019 | B1 | EP2963767 | 26.10.2016 | A4 | EP2963767 | 06.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014KR08272 | 03.09.2014 | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034262 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101632350B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2016 | B1 | KR20150029161 | 18.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20130107960 | 09.09.2013 |