EP2928992 - ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS AND INDUSTRIAL PROCESS FLUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuchs Petrolub SE Friesenheimer Strasse 17 68169 Mannheim / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEODHAR, D. James 3814 Tradition Boulevard St. Charles, Illinois 60175 / US | 02 /
TOMAS, Gema Del Olmo Riera de Nofre 2A E-08970 Sant Joan Despi / ES | 03 /
THEIS, Heinz Gerhard Finkenweg 19 67368 Westheim / DE | 04 /
LITTLEY, Paul Roger 153 Hassall Road Alsager / GB | 05 /
DUNCAN, Michael P. 2441 Wydown Lane Aurora, Illinois 60502 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2015/42] | 01 /
DEODHAR, Dr. D. James 3814 Tradition Boulevard St. Charles, Illinois 60175 / US | ||
02 /
TOMAS, Gema Del Olmo Riera de Nofre 2A E-08970 Sant Joan Despi / ES | |||
03 /
THEIS, Heinz Gerhard Finkenweg 19 67368 Westheim / DE | |||
04 /
LITTLEY, Paul Roger 153 Hassall Road Alsager / GB | |||
05 /
DUNCAN, Michael P. 2441 Wydown Lane Aurora, Illinois 60502 / US | Representative(s) | mepat Patentanwälte Dr.Mehl-Mikus, Goy, Dr Drobnik PartGmbB Eisenlohrstraße 31 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2015/42] | Atkinson, Jennifer, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14843196.8 | 03.02.2014 | [2015/42] | WO2014US14453 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015116233 | Date: | 06.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928992 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928992 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.08.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10M133/04, C10M133/06, C10M173/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
C10M173/00 (EP,US);
C10M133/04 (RU);
C10M133/44 (US);
C10M133/06 (RU);
C10M135/04 (US);
C10M137/04 (US);
C10M145/00 (US);
C10M169/04 (US);
C10M169/044 (US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1065 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/104 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/043 (EP,US);
C10N2030/06 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | C10M133/04, C10M133/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADDITIVZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND INDUSTRIELLE PROZESSFLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2015/42] | English: | ADDITIVE COMPOSITIONS AND INDUSTRIAL PROCESS FLUIDS | [2015/42] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ADDITIFS ET FLUIDES DE TRAITEMENT INDUSTRIELS | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 25.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | LU | 03.02.2019 | MT | 03.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
MT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
MT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | LT | 01.08.2018 | |
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 01.08.2018 | |
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5763372 (TERSIGNI SAMUEL H [US], et al); | [A]US5985803 (RIZVI SYED Q A [US], et al); | [A]US6648929 (DALY DANIEL T [US], et al); | [A]US2006264337 (WENDEROTH BERND [DE], et al); | [A]EP2520639 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) |