EP3045362 - CONTROL APPARATUS FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/29] | HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE | ||
[2019/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jatco Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2020/04] |
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states Jatco Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | ||
For all designated states Nissan Motor Co., Ltd 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAISHI, Hironori c/o JATCO Ltd 700-1 Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14843247.9 | 04.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014JP73276 | Priority number, date | JP20130191097 | 13.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013191097 | [2016/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015037502 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3045362 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3045362 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/10, B60K6/48, B60K6/543, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W20/00, F16H61/02, F16H61/662, B60K6/387, B60W10/08, B60W10/107, B60W10/30, B60W30/18, B60W20/40, B60W30/186 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
B60W20/30 (US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (US);
B60W10/107 (EP,US);
B60W10/30 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (US);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60W20/40 (EP,US);
B60W30/18018 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP,US);
B60W30/18072 (US);
B60W30/186 (EP,US);
F16H61/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/662 (EP,US);
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4825 (EP,US);
B60W2520/00 (US);
B60W2520/04 (EP,US);
B60W2540/16 (EP,US);
B60W2710/06 (US);
B60W2710/10 (US);
B60W2710/1005 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/93 (EP,US);
Y10S903/945 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/29] | B60W10/10, B60K6/48, B60K6/543, B60W10/02, B60W10/06, B60W20/00, F16H61/02, F16H61/662 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYBRIDFAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/29] | English: | CONTROL APPARATUS FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2019/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2016/29] |
Former [2016/29] | HYBRID VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2016 | Translation filed | 03.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 19.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.09.2014 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | NL | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | GB | 04.09.2020 | IE | 04.09.2020 | LU | 04.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | FR | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 04.09.2014 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 04.09.2014 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
GB | 04.09.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
IE | 04.09.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
FR | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
LU | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NL | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 22.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0572279 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 15 *; | [A]US6335573 (EGUCHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 5, lines 9-20 *; | [A]JP2010190266 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0011] , [0017] , [0019] , [0020] *; | [A]WO2013058139 (JATCO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH0914416 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO, et al); | [A]JP2001208177 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2006170265 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2006234043 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [A]JP2008179242 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2012076740 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2012197904 (JATCO LTD) | by applicant | JPH08312741 | JP2012206663 |