Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] |
21.12.2017 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
07.11.2017 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
21.04.2017 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
14.04.2017 | Change - classification | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
14.04.2017 | Change - classification | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
18.11.2016 | Change - extension states | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
30.09.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2016 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
09.03.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.02.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.02.2016 | Change - representative | |
08.02.2016 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.03.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.03.2015 | PCT data prior to European publication |