EP3044948 - DIGITAL CAMERA UTILIZING SURFACE FOR TEMPORARY MOUNTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Podo Labs, Inc. 5684 Bay Street 532 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Edmond Jaehyun 1710 North Moorpark Road Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
PULLMAN, Samuel 4942 Pine Street La Mesa, CA 91942 / US | 03 /
CHOI, Jae Hoon 5684 Bay Street, 532 Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14844652.9 | 10.09.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US54990 | Priority number, date | US201361876709P | 11.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361876709 P | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015038646 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044948 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G03B17/04 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/14 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/561 (EP,KR,US);
G03B17/565 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/50 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Title | German: | DIGITALKAMERA MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHE ZUR VORÜBERGEHENDEN MONTAGE | [2016/29] | English: | DIGITAL CAMERA UTILIZING SURFACE FOR TEMPORARY MOUNTING | [2016/29] | French: | APPAREIL PHOTO NUMÉRIQUE FAISANT APPEL À UNE SURFACE DE MONTAGE TEMPORAIRE | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6070749 (JOULIA GERARD [FR]); | [Y]US7133280 (LOVE JOHN S [US]); | [Y]US7750778 (FULLERTON LARRY W [US], et al); | [Y]US8206047 (ISAAC STEVEN ALFRED [US], et al); | [Y]US2013048817 (WANG STONE [TW], et al); | [A]US2013057708 (GOVIC RICK-WILLIAM [AU]); | [A]US2013107062 (OKAZAKI YOSHINORI [JP]); | [A]US2013188047 (SLEVIN RICHARD S [US], et al); | [Y] - "Imaging Resource Camera Reviews.", NIKON D5100 REVIEW., (2011), URL: http://www.imaging-resource.com/PRODS/D5100/D5100A.HTM, (20141116), XP008183038 | [Y] - "Nordic Semiconductor . Application: Remote Control.", NEW RELEASE, (20140724), URL: http://www.nordicsemi.com/News/News-releases/Product-Related-News/Bluetooth-Smart-DSLR -camera-remote-can-be-controlled-from-any-Bluetooth-v4.0-smartphone-and-uses-Nordic-Semi conductor-nRF8002-to-offer-10-year-battery-life, (20141116), XP008183044 |