EP3046570 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING THE KIDNEY FROM ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Virginia Patent Foundation 722 Preston Avenue, Suite 107 Charlottesville, VA 22903 / US | [2020/07] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states University of Virginia Patent Foundation 250 West Main Street, Suite 300 Charlottesville, VA 22902 / US | ||
For all designated states Swaminathan, Sundararaman 1136 Rustic Willow Lane Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWAMINATHAN, Sundararaman 1136 Rustic Willow Lane Charlottesville, VA 22911 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2016/30] | Fyfe, Fiona Allison Watson Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14845208.9 | 22.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014US56751 | Priority number, date | US201361880272P | 20.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361880272 P | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042515 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3046570 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3046570 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61P13/12, A61K38/16 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
A61K38/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K31/568 (EP,US);
A61K33/26 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/436, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/44, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/568, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2017/25] | A61K38/00, A61P13/12 | ||
Former IPC [2016/30] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ DER NIEREN VOR ISCHÄMISCHEN REPERFUSIONSSCHÄDEN | [2016/30] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING THE KIDNEY FROM ISCHEMIA REPERFUSION INJURY | [2016/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PROTÉGER LE REIN D'UNE LÉSION D'ISCHÉMIE-REPERFUSION | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 08.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2014 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | DK | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | FI | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | MT | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | TR | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | LU | 22.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.09.2014 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
MT | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
TR | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
LU | 22.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
DK | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
FI | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011053268 (TOMOSUGI NAOHISA [JP]) [A] 1-15*cf. abstract, claims 1, 14 and 15*; | [I]WO2011143232 (WESTERMAN MARK E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 *cf. para. [0002] at page 1, sections [0006] and [0009] at pages 2 and 3, sections [0017] to [0020] at pages 4 and 5, claims 1-5, 42 and 43*; | [Y] - ANJA HAASE-FIELITZ ET AL, "Urine hepcidin has additive value in ruling out cardiopulmonary bypass-associated acute kidney injury: an observational cohort study", CRITICAL CARE, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD., LONDON, GB, (20110804), vol. 15, no. 4, doi:10.1186/CC10339, ISSN 1364-8535, page R186, XP021114886 [Y] 1-15 *cf. abstract and "conclusion" at page 1* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/cc10339 | [Y] - C. ZHOU ET AL, "Elevated expression of hepcidin post-renal ischemia reperfusion injury", ACTA BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA SINICA, US, (20130224), vol. 45, no. 4, doi:10.1093/abbs/gmt013, ISSN 1672-9145, pages 342 - 344, XP055336759 [Y] 1-15 *cf. first para. of left-sided col. at page 342, 2nd para. of the left-sided col. at page 343 bridging with 1st para. of the right-hand col.* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/abbs/gmt013 | [Y] - J. R. PROWLE ET AL, "Greater increase in urinary hepcidin predicts protection from acute kidney injury after cardiopulmonary bypass", NEPHROLOGY DIALYSIS TRANSPLANTATION., GB, (20120201), vol. 27, no. 2, doi:10.1093/ndt/gfr387, ISSN 0931-0509, pages 595 - 602, XP055369615 [Y] 1-15 *cf. page 595, abstract and "conclusions" at page 601* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ndt/gfr387 | International search | [Y]US2006019339 (LAUTH XAVIER [US], et al); | [Y]US2007218063 (SKURKOVICH BORIS [US], et al); | [Y]US2010204122 (HUANG XI [US]); | [Y]WO2013086143 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [X] - SHAH ET AL., "The role of catalytic iron in acute kidney injury", CLIN J AM SOC NEPHROL., (20111001), vol. 6, pages 2329 - 2331, XP055254663 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2215/CJN.08340811 | [Y] - HINGORANI ET AL., "Ironing out the pathogenesis of acute kidney injury", AM J KIDNEY DIS., (20090401), vol. 53, pages 569 - 571, XP055083549 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.ajkd.2009.01.002 | [Y] - MISHRA ET AL., "Amelioration of ischemic acute renal injury by neutrophil gelatinase-associated lipocalin", J AM SOC NEPHROL., (20041201), vol. 15, pages 3073 - 3082, XP055336756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000145013.44578.45 | [Y] - ZHOU ET AL., "Elevated expression of hepcidin post-renal ischemia reperfusion injury", ACTA BIOCHIM BIOPHYS SIN, (20130224), vol. 45, pages 342 - 344, XP055336759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/abbs/gmt013 | [Y] - HAASE ET AL., "Novel biomarkers, oxidative stress, and the role of labile iron toxicity in cardiopulmonary bypass-associated acute kidney injury", J AM COLL CARDIOL., (20100511), vol. 55, pages 2024 - 2033, XP029647868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2009.12.046 | [Y] - SCHNELLMANN ET AL., "Chapter 15. Pathophysiology of Nephrotoxic Acute Renal Failure", ATLAS OF DISEASE OF THE KIDNEY, (19990106), pages 15.1 - 15.14, URL: http://www.kidneyatlas.org/book1/adkl_15.pdf, XP055336760 | by applicant | US4554101 | WO2013086143 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AAH20612.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP_115930.1 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP_445921.1 | - BIRE et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 242, page 423 | - HUSTON et al., Proc. Nat'l Acad. Sci. USA, (19880000), vol. 85, page 5879 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 321, page 522 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, page 323 | - WINTER; MILSTEIN, Nature, (19910000), vol. 349, page 293 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268 | - KARLIN; ALTSCHUL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - The Peptides, Academic Press, (19810000), vol. 3, pages 3 - 88 | - Methods for General and Molecular Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, (19940000), page 574 | - DEVEREUX et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19840000), vol. 12, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19900000), vol. 87, no. 14, pages 5509 - 13 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, no. 3, pages 403 - 10 | - KYTE; DOOLITTLE, J. Mol. Biol., (19820000), vol. 157, pages 105 - 132 | - CHOU; FASMAN, Biochemistry, (19740000), vol. 13, pages 222 - 245 | - Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19780000), vol. 47, pages 251 - 276 | - Biophys. J., (19790000), vol. 26, pages 367 - 384 | - BAGSHAW SM, "The long-term outcome after acute renal failure", Current opinion in critical care, (20060000), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 561 - 6 | - KORKEILA M; RUOKONEN E; TAKALA J, "Costs of care, long-term prognosis and quality of life in patients requiring renal replacement therapy during intensive care", Intensive care medicine, (20000000), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 1824 - 31 | - DEVARAJAN P, "Cellular and molecular derangements in acute tubular necrosis", Current opinion in pediatrics, (20050000), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 193 - 9 | - DAGHER PC; HERGET-ROSENTHAL S; RUEHM SG; JO SK; STAR RA; AGARWAL R; MOLITORIS BA, "Newly developed techniques to study and diagnose acute renal failure", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20030000), vol. 14, no. 8, pages 2188 - 98 | - LI C; JACKSON RM, "Reactive species mechanisms of cellular hypoxia-reoxygenation injury", American journal of physiology Cell physiology, (20020000), vol. 282, no. 2, pages C227 - 41 | - FRIEDEWALD JJ; RABB H, "Inflammatory cells in ischemic acute renal failure", Kidney international, (20040000), vol. 66, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1523-1755.2004.761_3.x, pages 486 - 91, XP002429254 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1523-1755.2004.761_3.x | - BALIGA R; UEDA N; SHAH SV, "Increase in bleomycin-detectable iron in ischaemia/reperfusion injury to rat kidneys", The Biochemical journal, (19930000), vol. 291, doi:doi:10.1042/bj2910901, pages 901 - 5, XP055254670 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj2910901 | - VOOGD A; SLUITER W; VAN EIJK HG; KOSTER JF, "Low molecular weight iron and the oxygen paradox in isolated rat hearts", The Journal of clinical investigation, (19920000), vol. 90, no. 5, pages 2050 - 5 | - CASTANEDA MP; SWIATECKA-URBAN A; MITSNEFES MM; FEUERSTEIN D; KASKEL FJ; TELLIS V; DEVARAJAN P, "Activation of mitochondrial apoptotic pathways in human renal allografts after ischemiareperfusion injury", Transplantation, (20030000), vol. 76, no. l, pages 50 - 4 | - HIRAKAWA A; TAKEYAMA N; NAKATANI T; TANAKA T, "Mitochondrial permeability transition and cytochrome c release in ischemia-reperfusion injury of the rat liver", The Journal of surgical research, (20030000), vol. 111, no. 2, pages 240 - 7 | - AROUN A; ZHONG JL; TYRRELL RM; POURZAND C, "Iron, oxidative stress and the example of solar ultraviolet A radiation", Photochemical & photobiological sciences, (20120000), vol. 1 1, no. 1, pages 118 - 34 | - BALIGA R; ZHANG Z; BALIGA M; UEDA N; SHAH SV, "Role of cytochrome P-450 as a source of catalytic iron in cisplatin-induced nephrotoxicity", Kidney international, (19980000), vol. 54, no. 5, pages 1562 - 9 | - ZHANG W; WANG M; XIE HY; ZHOU L; MENG XQ; SHI J; ZHENG S, "Role of reactive oxygen species in mediating hepatic ischemia-reperfusion injury and its therapeutic applications in liver transplantation", Transplantation proceedings, (20070000), vol. 39, no. 5, pages 1332 - 7 | - HIMMELFARB J; MCMONAGLE E; FREEDMAN S; KLENZAK J; MCMENAMIN E; LE P; PUPIM LB; IKIZLER TA; THE PG, "Oxidative stress is increased in critically ill patients with acute renal failure", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20040000), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 2449 - 56 | - DE VRIES B; WALTER SJ; VON BONSDORFF L; WOLFS TG; VAN HEURN LW; PARKKINEN J; BUURMAN WA, "Reduction of circulating redox-active iron by apotransferrin protects against renal ischemia-reperfusion injury", Transplantation, (20040000), vol. 77, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1097/01.tp.0000115002.28575.e7, pages 669 - 75, XP002689444 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.tp.0000115002.28575.e7 | - BALIGA R; ZHANG Z; BALIGA M; SHAH SV, "Evidence for cytochrome P-450 as a source of catalytic iron in myoglobinuric acute renal failure", Kidney international, (19960000), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 362 - 9 | - BALIGA R; ZHANG Z; BALIGA M; UEDA N; SHAH SV, "In vitro and in vivo evidence suggesting a role for iron in cisplatin-induced nephrotoxicity", Kidney international, (19980000), vol. 53, no. 2, pages 394 - 401 | - ZAGER RA, "Combined mannitol and deferoxamine therapy for myohemoglobinuric renal injury and oxidant tubular stress. Mechanistic and therapeutic implications", The Journal of clinical investigation, (19920000), vol. 90, no. 3, pages 711 - 9 | - PALLER MS, "Hemoglobin- and myoglobin-induced acute renal failure in rats: role of iron in nephrotoxicity", The American journal of physiology, (19880000), vol. 255, no. 3, pages F539 - 44 | - MONTALBETTI N; SIMONIN A; KOVACS G; HEDIGER MA, "Mammalian iron transporters: families SLC11 and SLC40", Molecular aspects of medicine, (20130000), vol. 34, no. 2-3, pages 270 - 87 | - ABBOUD S; HAILE DJ, "A novel mammalian iron-regulated protein involved in intracellular iron metabolism", J Biol Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, no. 26, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M000713200, pages 19906 - 12, XP002219402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M000713200 | - DE DOMENICO I; WARD DM; LANGELIER C; VAUGHN MB; NEMETH E; SUNDQUIST WI; GANZ T; MUSCI G; KAPLAN J, "The molecular mechanism of hepcidin-mediated ferroportin down-regulation", Molecular biology of the cell, (20070000), vol. 18, no. 7, pages 2569 - 78 | - MOULOUEL B; HOUAMEL D; DELABY C; TCHERNITCHKO D; VAULONT S; LETTERON P; THIBAUDEAU O; PUY H; GOUYA L; BEAUMONT C et al., "Hepcidin regulates intrarenal iron handling at the distal nephron", Kidney international, (20130000), vol. 84, no. 4, pages 756 - 66 | - PARK CH; VALORE EV; WARING AJ; GANZ T, "Hepcidin, a urinary antimicrobial peptide synthesized in the liver", J Biol Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M008922200, pages 7806 - 10, XP055398215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M008922200 | - NEMETH E; TUTTLE MS; POWELSON J; VAUGHN MB; DONOVAN A; WARD DM; GANZ T; KAPLAN J, "Hepcidin regulates cellular iron efflux by binding to ferroportin and inducing its internalization", Science, (20040000), vol. 306, no. 5704, pages 2090 - 3 | - NEMETH E, "Targeting the hepcidin-ferroportin axis in the diagnosis and treatment of anemias", Advances in hematology, (20100000), vol. 2010, page 750643 | - DE DOMENICO I; WARD DM; KAPLAN J, "Hepcidin regulation: ironing out the details", The Journal of clinical investigation, (20070000), vol. 117, no. 7, pages 1755 - 8 | - IZAWA T; MURAKAMI H; WIJESUNDERA KK; GOLBAR HM; KUWAMURA M; YAMATE J, "Inflammatory regulation of iron metabolism during thioacetamide-induced acute liver injury in rats", Experimental and toxicologic pathology : official journal of the Gesellschaft fur Toxikologische Pathologie, (20140000), vol. 66, no. 2-3, pages 155 - 62 | - MAISETTA G; VITALI A; SCORCIAPINO MA; RINALDI AC; PETRUZZELLI R; BRANCATISANO FL; ESIN S; STRINGARO A; COLONE M; LUZI C et al., "pH-dependent disruption of Escherichia coli ATCC 25922 and model membranes by the human antimicrobial peptides hepcidin 20 and 25", The FEBS journal, (20130000), vol. 280, no. 12, pages 2842 - 54 | - KROOT, J. J. C.; TJALSMA, H.; FLEMING, R. E.; SWINKELS, D. W., "Hepcidin in human iron disorders: diagnostic implications", Clin. Chem., (20110000), vol. 57, pages 1650 - 1669 | - LIU Q; DAVIDOFF O; NISS K; HAASE VH, "Hypoxia-inducible factor regulates hepcidin via erythropoietin-induced erythropoiesis", The Journal of clinical investigation, (20120000), vol. 122, no. 12, pages 4635 - 44 | - HO J; RESLEROVA M; GALI B; GAO A; BESTLAND J; RUSH DN; NICKERSON PW; RIGATTO C, "Urinary hepcidin-25 and risk of acute kidney injury following cardiopulmonary bypass", Clinical journal of the American Society of Nephrology : CJASN, (20110000), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 2340 - 6 | - HAVASI A; BORKAN SC, "Apoptosis and acute kidney injury", Kidney international, (20110000), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 29 - 40 | - ERNEST S; BELLO-REUSS E, "Expression and function of P-glycoprotein in a mouse kidney cell line", The American journal of physiology, (19950000), vol. 269, no. 2, pages C323 - 33 | - LIANG HL; HILTON G; MORTENSEN J; REGNER K; JOHNSON CP; NILAKANTAN V, "MnTMPyP, a cell-permeant SOD mimetic, reduces oxidative stress and apoptosis following renal ischemia-reperfusion", American journal of physiology Renal physiology, (20090000), vol. 296, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1152/ajprenal.90533.2008, pages F266 - 76, XP009122658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajprenal.90533.2008 | - CHIEN CT; CHANG TC; TSAI CY; SHYUE SK; LAI MK, "Adenovirus-mediated bcl-2 gene transfer inhibits renal ischemia/reperfusion induced tubular oxidative stress and apoptosis", American journal of transplantation : official journal of the American Society of Transplantation and the American Society of Transplant Surgeons, (20050000), vol. 5, no. 6, pages 1194 - 203 | - HUANG H; HE Z; ROBERTS LJ, 2ND; SALAHUDEEN AK, "Deferoxamine reduces cold-ischemic renal injury in a syngeneic kidney transplant model", American journal of transplantation, (20030000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1531 - 7 | - ARKADOPOULOS N; NASTOS C; KALIMERIS K; ECONOMOU E; THEODORAKI K; KOUSKOUNI E; PAFITI A; KOSTOPANAGIOTOU G; SMYRNIOTIS V, "Iron chelation for amelioration of liver ischemia-reperfusion injury", Hemoglobin, (20100000), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 265 - 77 | - SCHNEIDER MP; SULLIVAN JC; WACH PF; BOESEN EI; YAMAMOTO T; FUKAI T; HARRISON DG; POLLOCK DM; POLLOCK JS, "Protective role of extracellular superoxide dismutase in renal ischemia/reperfusion injury", Kidney international, (20100000), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 374 - 81 | - LIU W; KATO M; AKHAND AA; HAYAKAWA A; SUZUKI H; MIYATA T; KUROKAWA K; HOTTA Y; ISHIKAWA N; NAKASHIMA I, "4-hydroxynonenal induces a cellular redox status-related activation of the caspase cascade for apoptotic cell death", Journal of cell science, (20000000), vol. 113, pages 635 - 41 | - CHATURVEDI S; YUEN DA; BAJWA A; HUANG YW; SOKOLLIK C; HUANG L; LAM GY; TOLE S; LIU GY; PAN J et al., "Slit2 prevents neutrophil recruitment and renal ischemia-reperfusion injury", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20130000), vol. 24, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1681/ASN.2012090890, pages 1274 - 87, XP055300232 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2012090890 | - KINSEY GR; LI L; OKUSA MD, "Inflammation in acute kidney injury", Nephron Experimental nephrology, (20080000), vol. 109, no. 4, pages el02 - 7 | - BERBERAT PO; KATORI M; KACZMAREK E; ANSELMO D; LASSMAN C; KE B; SHEN X; BUSUTTIL RW; YAMASHITA K; CSIZMADIA E et al., "Heavy chain ferritin acts as an antiapoptotic gene that protects livers from ischemia reperfusion injury", FASEB journal : official publication of the Federation of American Societies for Experimental Biology, (20030000), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 1724 - 6 | - GIGLIOTTI JC; HUANG L; YE H; BAJWA A; CHATTRABHUTI K; LEE S; KLIBANOV AL; KALANTARI K; ROSIN DL; OKUSA MD, "Ultrasound prevents renal ischemia-reperfusion injury by stimulating the splenic cholinergic anti-inflammatory pathway", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20130000), vol. 24, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1681/ASN.2013010084, pages 1451 - 60, XP055481938 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2013010084 | - KIELAR ML; JOHN R; BENNETT M; RICHARDSON JA; SHELTON JM; CHEN L; JEYARAJAH DR; ZHOU XJ; ZHOU H; CHIQUETT B et al., "Maladaptive role of IL-6 in ischemic acute renal failure", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20050000), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 3315 - 25 | - NECHEMIA-ARBELY Y; BARKAN D; PIZOV G; SHRIKI A; ROSE-JOHN S; GALUN E; AXELROD JH, "IL-6/IL-6R axis plays a critical role in acute kidney injury", Journal of the American Society of Nephrology : JASN, (20080000), vol. 19, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1681/ASN.2007070744, pages 1106 - 15, XP002635696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1681/ASN.2007070744 | - PALLER, M. S.; HEDLUND, B. E, "Extracellular iron chelators protect kidney cells from hypoxia/reoxygenation", Free Radic. Biol. Med., (19940000), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1016/0891-5849(94)90099-X, pages 597 - 603, XP023523214 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-5849(94)90099-X | - MISHRA, J. et al., "Amelioration of ischemic acute renal injury by neutrophil gelatinase-associated lipocalin", J. Am. Soc. Nephrol., (20040000), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1097/01.ASN.0000145013.44578.45, pages 3073 - 3082, XP055336756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ASN.0000145013.44578.45 | - ABOLFAZL ZARJOU; SUBHASHINI BOLISETTY; RENY JOSEPH; AMIE TRAYLOR; EUGENE O. APOSTOLOV; PAOLO AROSIO; JOZSEF BALLA; JILL VERLANDER;, "Proximal tubule H-ferritin mediates iron trafficking in acute kidney injury", J Clin Invest., (20131001), vol. 123, no. 10, pages 4423 - 4434 | - BAUMINGER ER; HARRISON PM; HECHEL D; NOWIK I; TREFFRY A, "Iron (III) can be transferred between ferritin molecules", Proc Biol Sci., (19910622), vol. 244, no. 1311, pages 211 - 7 | - GOLAB F; KADKHODAEE M; ZAHMATKESH M; HEDAYATI M; ARAB H; SCHUSTER R et al., "Ischemic and non-ischemic acute kidney injury cause hepatic damage", Kidney Int., (20090000), vol. 75, pages 783 - 792 | - GANZ T, "Macrophages and systemic iron homeostasis", J Innate Immun., (20120000), vol. 4, no. 5-6, pages 446 - 53 | - CHASTON T; CHUNG B; MASCARENHASM; MARKS J; PATEL B; SRAI SK; SHARP P, "Evidence for differential effects of hepcidin in macrophages and intestinal epithelial cells", Gut, (20080000), vol. 57, pages 374 - 82 | - YANG F; LIU XB; QUINONES M; MELBY PC; GHIO A; HAILE DJ, "Regulation of reticuloendothelial iron transporter MTP1 (Slcl la3) by inflammation", J Biol Chem., (20021018), vol. 277, no. 42, pages 39786 - 91 | - GOSS JA; SEU P; GAO FQ; WYLLIE S, "Ischemia-reperfusion of rat liver modulates hepcidin in vivo expression", Liver Transpl., (20050700), vol. 11, no. 7, pages 800 - 6 | - NICOLAS G; BENNOUN M; DEVAUX I; BEAUMONT C; GRANDCHAMP B; KAHN A; VAULONT S, "Lack of hepcidin gene expression and severe tissue iron overload in upstream stimulatory factor 2 (USF2) knockout mice", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA., (20010717), vol. 98, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.151179498, pages 8780 - 5, XP002211395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.151179498 | - AKCAY A; NGUYEN Q; EDELSTEIN CL, "Mediators of inflammation in acute kidney injury", Mediators Inflamm., (20090000), vol. 2009, page 137072 | - WRIGHTING DM; ANDREWS NC, "Interleukin-6 induces hepcidin expression through STAT3", Blood, (20061101), vol. 108, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2006-06-027631, pages 3204 - 9, XP055072577 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-06-027631 | - DE DOMENICO I; ZHANG TY; KOENING CL; BRANCH RW; LONDON N; LO E; DAYNES RA; KUSHNER JP; LI D; WARD DM, "Hepcidin mediates transcriptional changes that modulate acute cytokine-induced inflammatory responses in mice", J Clin Invest., (20100700), vol. 120, no. 7, pages 2395 - 405 | - RUCHALA; NEMETH, "The pathophysiology and pharmacology of hepcidin", Trends in Pharmacological Sciences, (20140000), vol. 35, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tips.2014.01.004, page 155, XP055333435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tips.2014.01.004 | - YOUNG et al., Antioxid Redos Signal, (20130917), vol. 20, no. 8, page 1181 |