EP3049625 - GAS TURBINE BLADE COMPRISING IMPINGEMENT COOLING BAFFLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/31] | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A BAFFLE-CONTAINING BLADE | ||
[2020/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPANGLER, Brandon W. 25 Valerie Drive Vernon, Connecticut 06066 / US | 02 /
OTERO, Edwin 580 Andrews Street Southington, Connecticut 06489 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Bridge, Kerry Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14845222.0 | 16.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US55765 | Priority number, date | US201361879454P | 18.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361879454 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042009 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049625 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
F01D5/189 (EP);
F01D5/187 (US);
F01D5/147 (US);
F01D5/186 (US);
F01D5/188 (US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/13 (US);
F05D2230/22 (EP,US);
F05D2230/31 (US);
F05D2240/81 (US);
F05D2260/201 (EP);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | F01D5/14, F01D5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL MIT PRALLKÜHLBLECH UND ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/45] | English: | GAS TURBINE BLADE COMPRISING IMPINGEMENT COOLING BAFFLE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A BLADE | [2020/45] | French: | AUBE DE MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ COMPRENANT UNE PLAQUE DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR IMPACT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2020/45] |
Former [2016/31] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PRALLBLECHS MIT EINER KLINGE | ||
Former [2016/31] | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR A BAFFLE-CONTAINING BLADE | ||
Former [2016/31] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR UNE PALE CONTENANT UN DÉFLECTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 17.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3700348 (CORSMEIER ROBERT J, et al) [I] 1-9 * figures 1-8 * * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 65 *; | [XI]US3930748 (REDMAN ROBERT FREDERICK, et al) [X] 1-4,7,8 * figures 1,2, 4, 5, 6 * * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 2, line 10 - line 29 * * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 50 * [I] 5,6,9; | [XI]US4616976 (LINGS BARRY W [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 58 * [I] 4,9; | [A]EP2607624 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 10-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4859141 (MAISCH HELMUT [DE], et al); | [X]US6142734 (LEE CHING-PANG [US]); | [Y]US2006104818 (MCMILLAN ALISON J [GB], et al); | [Y]US2012251330 (SUZUKI AKANE [US], et al); | [Y]EP2607624 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |