EP3048125 - POLYESTER PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMON Akihiro c/o Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | 02 /
IKEGAWA Keiichi c/o Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | 03 /
NAITO Jun c/o Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | 04 /
TABATA Keiichi c/o Sakai Chemical Industry Co., Ltd. 2, Ebisujimacho 5-cho Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | 01 /
KAMON Akihiro c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 5-1 EBISUJIMA-CHO SAKAI-KU SAKAI-SHI Osaka 590-0985 / JP | ||
02 /
IKEGAWA Keiichi c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 5-1 EBISUJIMA-CHO SAKAI-KU SAKAI-SHI Osaka 590-0985 / JP | |||
03 /
NAITO Jun c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 5-1 EBISUJIMA-CHO SAKAI-KU SAKAI-SHI Osaka 590-0985 / JP | |||
04 /
TABATA Keiichi c/o SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO. LTD. 5-1 EBISUJIMA-CHO SAKAI-KU SAKAI-SHI Osaka 590-0985 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Duckworth, Timothy John J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14845567.8 | 18.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014JP74626 | Priority number, date | JP20130195167 | 20.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013195167 | [2016/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015041271 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048125 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/85, C08G63/80, // C08K3/28 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
C08G63/85 (EP,US);
C08G63/183 (US);
C08G63/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | C08G63/85 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | POLYESTERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/30] | English: | POLYESTER PRODUCTION METHOD | [2016/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYESTER | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2016 | Translation filed | 16.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 13.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 19.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007260002 (XIA ZHIYONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * examples 33, 34; claims 17, 30, 34 *; | [Y]EP2184309 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0079]; examples 2, 4; claims 7, 11-13; table 1 *; | [A]US2012088898 (SCHOENNAGEL MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0079]; example Example; claims 4, 8 * | International search | [Y]JP2008519903 (EASTMAN CHEMICAL CO.); | [Y]JP2009046593 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO); | [Y]JP2012077112 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO); | [A]JP2009508988 (EASTMAN CHEMICAL CO.); | [A]JP2008534739 (EASTMAN CHEMICAL CO.); | [A]JP2008519883 (EASTMAN CHEMICAL CO.) | by applicant | JPH063395B | JPS4957092 | JP2001064377 | JP2001114885 | JP2006188567 | JP2007530762 | JP2008519903 |