EP3050019 - SYSTEMS FOR ACCESS CONTROL AND SYSTEM INTEGRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xero Limited 101 Green Street 5th Floor San Francisco, California 94111 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRURY, Rodney Kenneth PO Box 8405 Havelock North 4130 / NZ | 02 /
VICKERS, Matthew John 3 Market Lane Wellington 6142 / NZ | [2016/43] |
Former [2016/31] | 01 /
DRURY, Rodney Kenneth 20-22 Munroe Street Napier 4110 / NZ | ||
02 /
VICKERS, Matthew John 3 Market Lane Wellington 6142 / NZ | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14846077.7 | 23.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US57055 | Priority number, date | US201361881314P | 23.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361881314 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042605 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050019 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/00, G06F17/30 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
G06Q40/128 (EP,US);
G06Q20/027 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (US);
G06Q20/108 (EP,US);
G06Q20/227 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | SYSTEME FÜR ZUGANGSKONTROLLE UND SYSTEMINTEGRATION | [2016/31] | English: | SYSTEMS FOR ACCESS CONTROL AND SYSTEM INTEGRATION | [2016/31] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ACCÈS ET INTÉGRATION SYSTÈME | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 29.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/20] | 09.04.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.05.2019 | 03.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010106615 (CHADWICK MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraph [0054]; figure 8 *; | [I]US2010125513 (CHUNG BYUNG-HYUN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-11 *; | [I]US8473377 (SMITH GERALD W [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 3, line 18 - column 18, line 56; figures 1-8 * | International search | [A]US2003105688 (BROWN OWEN H [US], et al); | [A]US8442881 (PATEL SAMIR KIRITKUMAR [US]); | [X]US2013232042 (SIMPSON THOMAS KIRK [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2013136051 (KHAN ANJUM [GB]) | by applicant | US2003105688 | US2010106615 | US2010125513 | US8442881 | US8473377 | US2013232042 | WO2013136051 |