EP3047725 - HYDROPONIC METHOD UTILIZING BENEFICIAL MICRO-ORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sassoh Industries Co., Ltd. 5-10, Kamimeguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-0051 / JP | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Takaaki 1-27 Oguri 4-chome Matsuyama-shi Ehime 790-0036 / JP | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Joseph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Schmitz, Joseph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 14846332.6 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014JP74898 | Priority number, date | JP20130194309 | 19.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013194309 | JP20140062680 | 25.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014062680 | [2016/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015041336 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047725 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G31/00, A01G7/00, A01G22/00, C05F9/04 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
A01G7/00 (EP,US);
A01G24/13 (EP,US);
A01G24/15 (EP,US);
A01G31/00 (EP,US);
A01G31/02 (US);
C05F9/04 (EP,US);
A01G2031/006 (EP);
Y02A40/20 (EP,US);
Y02P20/145 (EP,US);
Y02P60/21 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C05F9/04, C05F11/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | A01G31/00, A01G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | HYDROPONISCHES VERFAHREN MIT NÜTZLICHEN MIKROORGANISMEN | [2016/30] | English: | HYDROPONIC METHOD UTILIZING BENEFICIAL MICRO-ORGANISMS | [2016/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ HYDROPONIQUE UTILISANT DES MICRO-ORGANISMES BÉNÉFIQUES | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2016 | Translation filed | 18.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 16.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US4294037 (MOSSE BARBARA, et al) [I] 1-5,7-9 * the whole document * [A] 6,10,11; | [A]JPH05153863 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US6631585 (WILLIAMS JR MARVIN J [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]JP2005095135 (NAKAMURA KIYOSHI) [A] 5 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS55118390 (MOSSE B, et al); | [Y]JPH05153863 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [Y]JP2005095135 (NAKAMURA KIYOSHI); | [Y]JP2010279269 (KANSEI DEVICES KK, et al); | [Y] - YUKA MIWA, "Use of bahiagrass on hydroponic culture of lettuce", HORTICULTURAL RESEARCH ( JAPAN, (20080328), vol. 7, 1, page 345, XP008183317 | [Y] - TAKAAKI ISHII, "Dojo Sekai no Kyosei Katsudo 3 Arbuscular Mycorrhizal Fungi to sono Partner Saikin no Katsuyo Gijutsu (2", TAKII SAIZENSEN AUTUMN ISSUE, (2011), pages 55 - 57, XP055342010 | by applicant | - "Bacteria isolated from spores of an arbuscular mycorrhizal fungus, Gigaspora margarita, promotes hyphal growth of the arbuscular mycorrhizal fungus, and has phosphate solubilizing ability and nitrogen", ANDRE FREIRE CRUZ, Horticultural Research, JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 9, page 265 | - "Study on soil management by using an arbuscular mycorrhizal fungus and a micro-organism associated with the fungus and a partner plant", ISHII, TAKAAKI, IFO Research Communications, INSTITUTE FOR FERMENTATION, (2012), vol. 26, pages 87 - 100 | - "Use of bahiagrass in hydroponic cultivation of salad lettuce", MIWA, YUKA, Horticultural Research, JAPANESE SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 7, page 345 |