EP3047432 - METHODS FOR GENERATING A WORK-ORDER IN REAL TIME AND DEVICES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Profit Strategies Inc. 806 Linden Avenue Suite 300 Rochester, NY 14625 / US | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'AMICO, James, W. 39 Hyacinth Lane Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
BACCARO, Paul, M. 66 Daylilly Lane Rochester, NY 14626 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Matthew 90 Chardonnay Drive Fairport, NY 14450 / US | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Savi, Massimiliano, et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 14846626.1 | 18.09.2014 | [2016/30] | WO2014US56311 | Priority number, date | US201314030887 | 18.09.2013 Original published format: US201314030887 | [2016/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015042267 | Date: | 26.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047432 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06311 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06313 (US);
G06Q30/0219 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0611 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/30] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES ARBEITSAUFTRAGS IN ECHTZEIT UND VORRICHTUNGEN DAFÜR | [2016/30] | English: | METHODS FOR GENERATING A WORK-ORDER IN REAL TIME AND DEVICES THEREOF | [2016/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉNÉRER UN ORDRE DE TRAVAIL EN TEMPS RÉEL ET DISPOSITIFS CORRESPONDANTS | [2016/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/23] | 31.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.01.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2008288539 (JACOBS SIMON [CA]); | [A]US2010191611 (BIRO JANOS [US]); | [A]US2011015963 (CHAFLE GIRISH BHIMRAO [IN], et al); | [X]US2011054978 (MOHIL RAKSHAT SINGH [US]); | [A]US2012284077 (XIAO GUOXIAN [US], et al); | [A]WO2012162736 (YARRIS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US8494581 (BARBOSA FRANK A [US], et al) |