EP2949260 - ENDOSCOPE AND ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAJIMA, Sho OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
NAKAJIMA Sho c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14847164.2 | 23.04.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014JP61423 | Priority number, date | JP20130201899 | 27.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013201899 | [2015/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045463 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949260 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/06, A61B1/018, A61B1/07 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
A61B1/00117 (US);
A61B1/00126 (EP,US);
A61B1/00172 (EP,US);
A61B1/063 (US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | A61B1/00, A61B1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP UND ENDOSKOPSYSTEM | [2015/49] | English: | ENDOSCOPE AND ENDOSCOPIC SYSTEM | [2015/49] | French: | ENDOSCOPE ET SYSTÈME ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | Translation filed | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 26.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08106058 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]JPH08106057 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *; | [X]JPH09131349 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09292575 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2005342350 (PENTAX CORP) [X] 1,2,8,9 * abstract * [I] 3-7 | International search | [A]JPH08106058 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH08106057 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH09131349 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH09292575 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [A]JP2005342350 (PENTAX CORP) | by applicant | JP2011115252 |