EP3048950 - MICRO-DISPLAY BASED SLIT LAMP ILLUMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Iridex Corporation 1212 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/52] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Topcon Medical Laser Systems, Inc. 606 Enterprise Court Livermore, CA 94550 / US | ||
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Topcon Medical Laser Systems, Inc. 3130 Coronado Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRAMECK, Chris 263 E. Red Oak Drive Apt. N Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
HALSTEAD, Greg 137 W. Ferndale Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 14847231.9 | 25.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US57360 | Priority number, date | US201314037969 | 26.09.2013 Original published format: US201314037969 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015048227 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048950 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/135, A61B3/00 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
A61B3/0008 (EP,US);
A61B3/135 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | A61B3/135 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | AUF MIKROANZEIGE BASIERENDES SPALTLAMPENBELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/31] | English: | MICRO-DISPLAY BASED SLIT LAMP ILLUMINATION SYSTEM | [2016/31] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE DE LAMPE À FENTE, BASÉ SUR UN MICRO-AFFICHAGE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 11.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.07.2023 | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/45] | 02.07.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 04.07.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4196980 (HEINE HELMUT A [DE]) [A] 5 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 9 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5943118 (KOSCHMIEDER INGO [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 52 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JP2000262476 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2005107708 (WROBEL WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0039] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2009145738 (OPTOTEK D O O [SI], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 2, lines 27-30 * * page 3, lines 19-29 * * page 4, lines 24-26 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN102768403 (SHANGHAI MEIAO PREC INSTR CO LTD) [A] 1-15* figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US2003071970 (DONNERHACKE KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al); | [A]US2009153796 (RABNER ARTHUR [IL]); | [X]WO2012060724 (WELLS ANTHONY PHILIP [NZ], et al) |