EP3054374 - TOUCH PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 1-5-1, Taito Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Yutaka c/o Toppan Printing., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito Taito-ku, Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14847392.9 | 26.09.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014JP04949 | Priority number, date | JP20130204458 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013204458 | [2016/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045408 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054374 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, B32B7/02, B32B9/00, B32B15/08, G06F3/044, H01B5/14 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/02 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/283 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSTAFEL | [2016/32] | English: | TOUCH PANEL | [2016/32] | French: | ÉCRAN TACTILE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2016 | Translation filed | 03.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 07.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013051288 ; | [A]US2010265206 (CHEN KUANG-JUNG [TW]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0023] - [0046]; figures 1A, 1B, 2 *; | [A]US2010309152 (KUSUDA YASUJI [JP], et al) [A] 2,3 * paragraphs [0078] - [0079]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP2450915 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0043]; figure 5 *; | [XI]US2012256878 (HASHIMOTO TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0006] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0061] - [0068]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0109] - [0130]; figures 10-12 * [I] 2-7; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 29, Database accession no. 2013-F46978, XP002768404 & WO2013051288 A1 20130411 (KURARAY CHEM CO LTD) [A] 7 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2011005793 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]JP2011150697 (NISSHA PRINTING); | [X]WO2013141275 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) |