EP3049092 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND KITS FOR ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University M454 Davison Building Durham, NC 27710 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMPSON, John, H. Dumc Box 3050 Durham, NC 27710 / US | 02 /
MITCHELL, Duane, A. Dumc Box 3050 Durham, NC 27710 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14847850.6 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US56502 | Priority number, date | US201361881486P | 24.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361881486 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015047901 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049092 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/26, A61K38/16, A61P35/00, A61K39/12 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K2239/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/164 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/4637 (EP,US);
A61K39/464838 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,US);
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/55522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55527 (US);
A61K2039/55533 (US);
A61K2039/55538 (US);
A61K2039/55544 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55566 (US);
A61K2039/55594 (US);
A61K2039/572 (US);
A61K2039/6081 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16171 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | A61K35/26, A61K38/16, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | 22.04.2016 | ME | 22.04.2016 | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND KITS ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER IMMUNREAKTION | [2016/31] | English: | COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND KITS FOR ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2016/31] | French: | COMPOSITIONS, PROCÉDÉS ET KITS POUR DÉCLENCHER UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 05.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/52] | 16.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2020 | 20.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP20207148.6 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.01.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0172782 (HOPE CITY [US]); | [A]US2004106159 (KERN FLORIAN [DE], et al); | [A]WO2004111080 (ISTITUTO GIANNINA GASLINI [IT], et al); | [A]US2005019344 (KHANNA RAJIV [AU], et al); | International search | [A]US2003118602 (DIAMOND DON J [US]); | [A]US2005019344 (KHANNA RAJIV [AU], et al); | [A]US2009148451 (NICOLETTE CHARLES A [US]); | [A]WO2009155535 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al); |