EP3038420 - RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Weiliang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Hantao Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
MA, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14848194.8 | 24.09.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014CN87265 | Priority number, date | CN201310442052 | 25.09.2013 Original published format: CN201310442052 | [2016/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015043465 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3038420 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3038420 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.05.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/02, // H04W48/12 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W28/16 (CN);
H04W72/044 (US);
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | H04W72/02, H04W16/10 | ||
Former IPC [2016/26] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR RESSOURCENZUWEISUNG | [2016/26] | English: | RESOURCE ALLOCATION METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2016/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCE | [2016/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | Translation filed | 24.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 14.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2014 | AL | 27.12.2017 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | GB | 24.09.2018 | IE | 24.09.2018 | LU | 24.09.2018 | MT | 24.09.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 24.09.2014 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
MT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 24.09.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010054171 (ZHU CHENXI [US], et al) [A] 7,8,15,16* paragraphs [0047] - [0057] *; | [A]US2011195732 (KIM SU NAM [KR], et al) [A] 7,8,15,16 * paragraphs [0045] , [0 49] , [0 62] *; | [A]WO2011130630 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-14 * paragraphs [0058] , [0 59] *; | [A]US2012269115 (ESTEVES EDUARDO S [US], et al) [A] 7,8,15,16 * paragraph [0040] *; | [A]GB2499418 (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6,9-14 * page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 25 *; | [YA] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Discussion on RAN2 Aspects of D2D Discovery", vol. RAN WG2, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-132823_D2D_DISCOVERY_V3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_83/Docs/, (20130810), XP050718544 [Y] 1,9 * section 4.2 * [A] 2-6,10-14 | [YA] - ZTE, "Discussion of D2D Discovery", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-133149 D2D DISCOVERY, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716361 [Y] 1,9 * page 6 section 3.1 * [A] 2-6,10-14 | [A] - HYANG SIN CHAE ET AL, "Radio resource allocation scheme for device-to-device communication in cellular networks using fractional frequency reuse", COMMUNICATIONS (APCC), 2011 17TH ASIA-PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20111002), doi:10.1109/APCC.2011.6152760, ISBN 978-1-4577-0389-8, pages 58 - 62, XP032115928 [A] 7,8,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APCC.2011.6152760 | [A] - BAO PENGCHENG ET AL, "Novel frequency reusing scheme for interference mitigation in D2D uplink underlaying networks", 2013 9TH INTERNATIONAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND MOBILE COMPUTING CONFERENCE (IWCMC), IEEE, doi:10.1109/IWCMC.2013.6583607, ISBN 978-1-4673-2479-3, (20130701), pages 491 - 496, (20130820), XP032478637 [A] 7,8,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWCMC.2013.6583607 | International search | [A]EP2489230 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]CN102792745 (NOKIA CORP); | [Y]CN102857969 (ZTE CORP) |