EP3051704 - DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOHARA Yuji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO Makiko c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 14848286.2 | 12.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014JP74196 | Priority number, date | JP20130199085 | 26.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013199085 | [2016/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045897 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051704 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/27, H03M13/11, H03M13/25, H03M13/29, H03M13/15, H04L1/00 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
H03M13/1165 (EP,KR,MX,US);
H03M13/271 (EP,KR,MX,US);
H03M13/036 (KR,MX);
H03M13/2792 (US);
H03M13/1102 (US);
H03M13/152 (EP,KR,US);
H03M13/255 (EP,KR,MX,US);
H03M13/2778 (EP,US);
H03M13/2906 (EP,KR,MX,US);
H03M13/616 (US);
H04L1/0003 (EP,US);
H04L1/0057 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | H03M13/19, H03M13/27 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2016/31] | English: | DATA PROCESSING DEVICE AND DATA PROCESSING METHOD | [2016/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | Translation filed | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP3051703 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-14 * paragraphs [0440] , [0441] * * paragraph [0461] * * paragraph [0485] - paragraph [0487] * * figures 7,8,9,17,22-27,40-44,91,104,109,113,118,119,120 *; | [A]EP2560310 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 8-14,21,24-26 * * claims 4-12 *; | [A]EP2214319 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0208] * * paragraph [0283] - paragraph [0296] * * figures 8,16,22,25,29,30,38-40,42-45,47-50,52-55,57-76 *; | [A] - "Digital Video Broadcasting (DVB); Next Generation broadcasting system to Handheld, physical layer specification (DVB-NGH)", ETSI EN 302 755 V1.3.1, (20121130), XP055248828 [A] 1-14 * page 220 - page 224 * * page 245 - page 251 * | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "CfT_Sony_LDPC_64APSK_annex.pdf", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20130212), XP017840337 [A] 3-6,10-13 * pages 65-70 * * page 90 - page 95 * | International search | [A]JP2013005124 (SONY CORP); | [A]JP2007006494 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JP2011523318 (THOMSON LICENSING); | [AP] - GUARNERI COMMUNICATIONS, "ATSC 3.0 Physical Layer Proposal Rev. 01 ANNEX A", THE PERFORMANCE OF SINGLE CARRIER MULTI-TONE(SCMT) MODULATION, (20131117), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.guarneri-communications.com/wp-content/uploads/2014/04/ATSC-3-PROPOSAL_anex-A.pdf, (20141029), XP055224951 | [AP] - BILL HAYES, "ATSC 3.0 Overview", URL: http://btsgold2014.unitbv.ro/uploads/presentations/Bill_Hayes_BTSGOLD2014.pdf, (20141029), XP055329348 | by applicant | - H. JIN; A. KHANDEKAR; R. J. MCELIECE, "Irregular Repeat-Accumulate Codes", PROCEEDINGS OF 2ND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON TURBO CODES AND RELATED TOPICS, (200009), pages 1 - 8 | - S. Y. CHUNG; G. D. FORNEY; T. J. RICHARDSON; R. URBANKE, "On the Design of Low-Density Parity-Check Codes within 0.0045 dB of the Shannon Limit", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LEGGERS, (200102), vol. 5, no. 2 |