EP3054741 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Sho c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
IWAMI, Hideki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIMURA, Osamu c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
ITAYA, Natsuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/32] | Application number, filing date | 14848511.3 | 24.06.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014JP66612 | Priority number, date | JP20130205609 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013205609 | [2016/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045525 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054741 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/12, H04L29/04, H04M1/00, H04M11/00, H04N1/00, H04W48/16 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/00217 (EP,US);
H04W72/56 (US);
H04N21/2385 (US);
H04N21/26216 (US);
H04N21/43637 (US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04M1/72415 (EP,US);
H04M2250/06 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0055 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG VORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2016/32] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2016/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2016 | Translation filed | 22.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2022 | 19.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/44] | 25.06.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002141393 (ERIKSSON GORAN A P [SE], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0032]; figures 3, 8 *; | [A]US2010297958 (MURAKAMI SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XY]EP2317812 (TOYOTA INFO TECHNOLOGY CT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,4,6-12; | [Y]US2012178368 (FLECK ROD G [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0106]; figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP2595356 (FUJITSU MOBILE COMM LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y] - SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY A RAO CISCO R LANPHIER M WESTERLUND ERICSSON AB M STIEMERLING (ED) H, "Real Time Streaming Protocol 2.0 (RTSP); draft-ietf-mmusic-rfc2326bis-34.txt", REAL TIME STREAMING PROTOCOL 2.0 (RTSP); DRAFT-IETF-MMUSIC-RFC2326BIS-34.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARDWORKINGDRAFT, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20130404), pages 1 - 302, XP015091640 [Y] 6-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2004528764 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (PUBL); | [X]WO2012094507 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [Y]JP2013183378 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2008278388 |