EP3053788 - EMERGENCY UNLOCKING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | For all designated states HONDA LOCK MFG. CO., LTD. 3700, Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-City, Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | [2018/52] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo Saitama 107-8556 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Lock MFG. Co., Ltd. 3700 Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-City, Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINOSHITA, Nobuaki c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
TAKAISHI, Yusuke c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
HIDAKA, Masatake c/o HONDA LOCK MFG. CO., LTD. 3700, Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-City Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | 04 /
WAKAI, Hayato c/o HONDA LOCK MFG. CO., LTD. 3700, Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-City Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | [2018/52] |
Former [2016/32] | 01 /
KINOSHITA Nobuaki c/o HONDA R&D Co. Ltd. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAISHI Yusuke c/o HONDA R&D Co. Ltd. 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
03 /
HIDAKA Masatake c/o HONDA LOCK MFG. Co. Ltd. 3700 Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-city Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | |||
04 /
WAKAI Hayato c/o HONDA LOCK MFG. Co. Ltd. 3700 Aza Wadayama Shimonaka Sadowara-cho Miyazaki-city Miyazaki 880-0293 / JP | Representative(s) | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [2018/52] |
Former [2016/32] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany LLP Singlspielerhaus Sendlinger Straße 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14848518.8 | 24.04.2014 | [2016/32] | WO2014JP61623 | Priority number, date | JP20130205566 | 30.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013205566 | [2016/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045465 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3053788 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3053788 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60R25/10, B62J1/12, E05B83/16, B62H5/00 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
E05B83/18 (EP);
B62H5/00 (EP);
B62H5/08 (EP);
B62K11/10 (EP);
E05B81/90 (EP);
B62K2202/00 (EP);
B62M7/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/32] | B60R25/10, B62J1/12, E05B83/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NOTENTRIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG VORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2016/32] | English: | EMERGENCY UNLOCKING DEVICE FOR VEHICLE | [2016/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉVERROUILLAGE D'URGENCE POUR VÉHICULE | [2016/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | Translation filed | 24.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/32] | 16.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2014 | AL | 26.12.2018 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | HR | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | MK | 26.12.2018 | MT | 26.12.2018 | NL | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | RS | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | SM | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | NO | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | GB | 24.04.2019 | IE | 24.04.2019 | LU | 24.04.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | FR | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
MT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.04.2014 | |
AL | 26.12.2018 | ||
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
GB | 24.04.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
FR | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 24.04.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
AT | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SM | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
NL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.12.2018 | |
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
RS | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
HR | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | |
NO | 26.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1524177 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 6] , [00 7] , [00 9] , [0 75] - [0091] - [ 130] - [0132] ** figures 18-21 *; | [XI]US2007285272 (UMEDA YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 17] , [0 42] - [0080] * * figures 1-12B * [I] 2,5 | International search | [A]JP2007176239 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2007276635 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO); | [A]JP2008037182 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) | Examination | DE4409559 | US2008127693 | by applicant | JP2007276635 |