EP3049378 - PREPARATION OF RADIOIODINATED 3-FLUOROPROPYL-NOR-BETA-CIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SpecGx LLC 385 Marshall Avenue Webster Groves, Missouri 63119 / US | [2018/28] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states SpecGx, LLC 385 Marshall Avenue Webster Groves, Missouri 63119 / US | ||
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Mallinckrodt LLC 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUDSON, Edmund C. 675 McDonnell Blvd. Hazelwood, Missouri 63042 / US | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14849233.3 | 25.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014US57404 | Priority number, date | US201361882039P | 25.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361882039 P | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015048250 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3049378 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3049378 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07B59/00, C07D451/02, C07F7/08 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
A61K51/0448 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON RADIO-IODINIERTEM 3-FLUOROPROPYL-NOR-BETA-CIT | [2016/31] | English: | PREPARATION OF RADIOIODINATED 3-FLUOROPROPYL-NOR-BETA-CIT | [2016/31] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE 3-FLUOROPROPYL-NOR-BETA-CIT RADIO-IODÉ | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.09.2014 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.09.2014 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.09.2014 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4190601 (DECKER QUINTIN W [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 8 - line 20 *; | [A]WO9818499 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-15* page 9 *; | [A]WO9857909 (MAP MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 8 *; | [Y]EP1127887 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * page 6 * | International search | [A]US4190601 (DECKER QUINTIN W [US], et al); | [A]US6123917 (CARROLL FRANK IVY [US]); | [A]US6447747 (PIROTTE ROBERT JEAN MARIE DENI [BE], et al); | [A]US6548041 (MELTZER PETER C [US], et al); | [A]US2003109708 (OKANO KYOKO [JP], et al); | [A]US2010210843 (HUDSON EDUMND C [US], et al); | [A] - BOIS, F ET AL., "Synthesis, radiolabeling, and baboon SPECT imaging of 2beta-carbomethoxy- 3beta-(3'-[1231]iodophenyl)tropane ([1231]YP256) as a serotonin transporter radiotracer.([1231] YP256) a potential serotonin transporter radiotracer", NUCL MED BIOL., vol. 35, no. 1, (2008), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.nr-bi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2276982, XP022460551 | [A] - STEHOUWER, JS ET AL., "Synthesis, Radiosynthesis, and Biological Evaluation of Fluorine-18 Labeled 2beta-Carbo(fluoroalkoxy)-3beta-(3'-((Z)-2-haloethenyl phenyl) nortropanes: Candidate Radioligands for In Vivo Imaging of the Serotonin Transporter with Positron Emission Tomography", J MED CHEM., vol. 51, no. 24, (2008), pages 7788 - 7799, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2668213/pdf/nihms-86624.pdf, (20141124), XP055335440 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm800781a |