EP3051617 - SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL STACK AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMOSHIGE, Yosuke c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
MIZUKAMI, Kimihiro c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
HIRAI, Tomoaki c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO. LTD. 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14849844.7 | 17.09.2014 | [2016/31] | WO2014JP74570 | Priority number, date | JP20130196731 | 24.09.2013 Original published format: JP 2013196731 | [2016/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015045986 | Date: | 02.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051617 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/12, H01M8/2432, H01M8/2428, H01M8/2425, H01M8/0206, H01M8/0215, H01M8/0217, H01M8/0228, H01M8/0297, // H01M8/124 | [2017/24] | CPC: |
H01M8/0297 (EP,US);
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
H01M8/0215 (EP,US);
H01M8/0217 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/0258 (US);
H01M8/2404 (US);
H01M8/2425 (EP);
H01M8/2428 (EP);
H01M8/2432 (EP,US);
H01M8/2457 (US);
H01M2008/1293 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | H01M8/24, H01M8/02, H01M8/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Title | German: | FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/31] | English: | SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL STACK AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/31] | French: | EMPILEMENT DE PILES À OXYDE SOLIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2016/31] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2016 | Translation filed | 12.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/31] | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013012058 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 9-12; | [XY]JP2007157352 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0094]; figures 5-7; claims 1-6 * [Y] 9-12; | [Y]JP2004265742 (KYOCERA CORP) [Y] 9-12 * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2011039187 (BAE JOONGMYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0046]; figure 15; claims 1-16 *; | [T]EP2736109 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [T] 1-12 | International search | [X]WO2013012058 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al); | [X]JP2007157352 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2004265742 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2011134538 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2010073631 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]WO2012128307 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2010038869 | JP2006310005 |