EP3015893 - IMAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IMAGING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGASAWARA Kotaro OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
FUJISAWA Yutaka OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 03 /
FUJIMOTO Takehide OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 04 /
KANNO Kiyotaka OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/42] |
Former [2016/18] | 01 /
OGASAWARA Kotaro c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
FUJISAWA Yutaka c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJIMOTO Takehide c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
KANNO Kiyotaka c/o OLYMPUS CORPORATION 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14850832.8 | 19.09.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014JP74914 | Priority number, date | JP20130209386 | 04.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013209386 | [2016/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015050008 | Date: | 09.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3015893 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/36, G02B7/28, G03B13/36, H04N5/232 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G02B7/36 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
G03B37/005 (EP,US);
H04N23/555 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DER BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/18] | English: | IMAGING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IMAGING DEVICE | [2016/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2016 | Translation filed | 26.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6088060 (SUDA HIROFUMI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2008122940 (MORI YUKIO [JP]); | [A]JP2012049628 (NIKON CORP) | International search | [X]JP2010021597 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JP5253688B | by applicant | JP2009133903 | JP2010204585 | JP2012108313 |