EP3054952 - COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE 6 INHIBITORS AND THE HER2 INHIBITOR LAPATINIB FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/33] | COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS AND EITHER HER2 INHIBITORS OR PI3K INHIBITORS | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acetylon Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 70 Fargo Street, Suite 205 Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMANG, David Lee 140 Hillside Road 3 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | 02 /
YANG, Min 8 North Street Newton, MA 02459 / US | 03 /
JONES, Simon S. 46 Westcott Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/43] |
Former [2016/33] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14851657.8 | 06.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014US59238 | Priority number, date | US201361888207P | 08.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361888207 P | [2016/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015054099 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054952 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3054952 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K31/517, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, A61K47/00, A61P35/00, A61K45/06, A61K31/5377, C07D239/42 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2016/33] | A61K31/505, A61K31/517, A61K31/519, A61K31/52, A61K47/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON HISTONDEACETYLASE 6 INHIBITOREN UND DEM HER2-INHIBITOR LAPATINIB ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS | [2022/17] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE 6 INHIBITORS AND THE HER2 INHIBITOR LAPATINIB FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER | [2022/15] | French: | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE 6 ET DE L'INHIBITEUR D'HER2 LAPATINIB POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN | [2022/17] |
Former [2016/33] | KOMBINATIONEN VON HISTONDEACETYLASEINHIBITOREN UND ENTWEDER HER2-INHIBITOREN ODER PI3K-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2016/33] | COMBINATIONS OF HISTONE DEACETYLASE INHIBITORS AND EITHER HER2 INHIBITORS OR PI3K INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2016/33] | COMBINAISONS D'INHIBITEURS D'HISTONE DÉSACÉTYLASE ET D'INHIBITEURS D'HER2 OU DE PI3K | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2016 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 03.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.03.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.12.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 26.10.2022 | AT | 26.10.2022 | CZ | 26.10.2022 | DK | 26.10.2022 | EE | 26.10.2022 | FI | 26.10.2022 | HR | 26.10.2022 | LT | 26.10.2022 | LV | 26.10.2022 | MC | 26.10.2022 | NL | 26.10.2022 | PL | 26.10.2022 | RO | 26.10.2022 | RS | 26.10.2022 | SE | 26.10.2022 | SI | 26.10.2022 | SK | 26.10.2022 | SM | 26.10.2022 | NO | 26.01.2023 | GR | 27.01.2023 | IS | 26.02.2023 | PT | 27.02.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SI | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SK | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 26.10.2022 | |
AT | 26.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
CZ | 26.10.2022 | ||
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RO | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
EE | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
DK | 26.10.2022 | ||
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
SM | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
PL | 26.10.2022 | ||
RS | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
IS | 26.02.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
HR | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
LV | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
GR | 27.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 26.10.2022 | |
FI | 26.10.2022 | ||
LT | 26.10.2022 | ||
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
SE | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
PT | 27.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 26.10.2022 | |
NL | 26.10.2022 | ||
NO | 26.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 26.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009126662 (SYNDAX PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * claims 1, 18, 26 *; | [A] - SADEGHI N ET AL, "Targeting the PI3K pathway for cancer therapy", FUTURE MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, FUTURE SCIENCE LTD, GB, (20120601), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:10.4155/FMC.12.56, ISSN 1756-8919, pages 1153 - 1169, XP008166436 [A] 3,9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4155/fmc.12.56 | International search | [X]WO2008076447 (ORDWAY RES INST [US], et al); | [X]US2008182865 (WITTA SAMIR E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2011091213 (ACETYLON PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012068109 (ACETYLON PHARMACEUTICALS [US], et al); | [Y] - TURKE, ALEXA B., "PIKing the right patient.", CLIN CANCER RES., vol. 16, no. 14, (20100715), pages 3523 - 3525, URL: http:// www.aacrjournals.org>, XP055333052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-10-1201 | [Y] - RAHMANI, MOHAMED ET AL., "Inhibition of PI-3 kinase sensitizes human leukemic cells to histone deacetylase inhibitor-mediated apoptosis through p44/42 MAP kinase inactivation and abrogation of p21 CIP1/WAF1 induction rather than AKT inhibition.", ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 6231 - 6242, XP055269982 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1206646 | [Y] - ALDANA-MASANGKAY, G.I. ET AL., "The role of HDAC6 in cancer''.", J. BIOMED. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), page 875824, XP055333054 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2011/875824 | Examination | - C. Qian ET AL, "Cancer Network Disruption by a Single Molecule Inhibitor Targeting Both Histone Deacetylase Activity and Phosphatidylinositol 3-Kinase Signaling", Clinical Cancer Research, US, (20120801), vol. 18, no. 15, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-0055, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 4104 - 4113, XP055350521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-12-0055 | by applicant | US2008182865 | WO2009126662 | - "Targeting the PI3K pathway for cancer therapy", SADEGHI N et al., Future Medicinal Chemistry, Future Science Ltd, (20120601), vol. 4, pages 1153 - 1169 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Publishing Company, (19900000), page 1418 | - Journal of Pharmaceutical Science, (19770000), vol. 66, page 2 | - HOLFORD, N. H. G.SCHEINER, L. B., Clin. Pharmacokinet., (19810000), vol. 6, pages 429 - 453 | - LOEWE, S.MUISCHNEK, H., Arch. Exp. Pathol Pharmacol., (19260000), vol. 114, pages 313 - 326 | - CHOU, T. C.TALALAY, P., Adv. Enzyme Regul., (19840000), vol. 22, pages 27 - 55 | WO2011US21982 | WO2011US60791 |