EP3056551 - PHOTOCATIONIC CURABLE INKJET INK, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PHOTOCATIONIC CURABLE INKJET INK, PRINTED ARTICLE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PRINTED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Printing Ink Mfg. Co. Ltd. TIC Oji Bldg., 12-4 Oji 1-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 1140002 / JP | [2016/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Shigenori c/o Tokyo Printing Ink Mfg. Co. Ltd. 397 Yoshino-cho 1-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-0811 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI Fumitaka c/o Tokyo Printing Ink Mfg. Co. Ltd. 397 Yoshino-cho 1-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-0811 / JP | [2016/33] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/33] | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14852265.9 | 02.10.2014 | [2016/33] | WO2014JP76415 | Priority number, date | JP20130209864 | 07.10.2013 Original published format: JP 2013209864 | [2016/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015053164 | Date: | 16.04.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3056551 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/36, B41J2/01, B41M5/00, C09D11/101 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/102 (US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (US);
B41J2/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/33] | Title | German: | PHOTOKATIONISCHE HÄRTBARE TINTENSTRAHLTINTE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE PHOTOKATIONISCHE HÄRTBARE TINTENSTRAHLTINTE, GEDRUCKTER ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES GEDRUCKTEN ARTIKELS | [2016/33] | English: | PHOTOCATIONIC CURABLE INKJET INK, PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PHOTOCATIONIC CURABLE INKJET INK, PRINTED ARTICLE, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR PRINTED ARTICLE | [2016/33] | French: | ENCRE À POLYMÉRISATION PHOTOCATIONIQUE POUR IMPRESSION AU JET D'ENCRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ARTICLE IMPRIMÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2016/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2016 | Translation filed | 29.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Search fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/33] | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010079568 (MIURA YUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * abstract *; | [X]JP2009280672 (KONICA MINOLTA IJ TECHNOLOGIES) [X] 1-14 * abstract *; | [X]US2005288386 (ISHIKAWA WATARU [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * abstract *; | [X]US2007254977 (SASA NOBUMASA [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * abstract *; | [X]EP1357159 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * abstract *; | [X]US2003222960 (TAKABAYASHI TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2009280672 (KONICA MINOLTA IJ TECHNOLOGIES, INC.); | [X]JP2006008791 (KONICA MINOLTA MEDICAL & GRAPHIC, INC.); | [A]JP2004243676 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC.); | [A]JP2011208090 (FUJIFILM CORP.) | by applicant | JP2004243676 | JP2011153255 | - The Latest / Optimization of UV Cured Resin, TECHNICAL INFORMATION INSTITUTE CO., LTD., (20080530), pages 103 - 116 |